Farrow v. Hotel Inn Brunswick Georgia 341 et al

Plaintiff: Latisha Denise Farrow
Defendant: J P, Hotel Inn Brunswick Georgia 341 and JB
Case Number: 2:2018cv00123
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
0 Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
1 Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #7 Motion to Amend/Correct and DIRECTS the Clerk to correct "Defendant JP" to "Defendant JB" upon the record and docket of this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 11/9/2018. (ca)
November 5, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION / Letter to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint regarding Defendant's Name by Latisha Denise Farrow. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(ca)
October 22, 2018 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable #3 Order filed 10/11/18. Return to sender. Mail sent to Latisha Denise Farrow. (ca)
October 15, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #4 Notice of Change of Address, signature was omitted. Set Deadlines: Compliance due by 10/29/2018. (ca)
October 15, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by Latisha Denise Farrow. (ca) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/19/2018: #1 Signature) (ca).
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 10/11/2018. (ca)
October 11, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Latisha Denise Farrow. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(ca)
October 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Latisha Denise Farrow. (Attachments: #1 Statement, #2 Police Report, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farrow v. Hotel Inn Brunswick Georgia 341 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J P
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hotel Inn Brunswick Georgia 341
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latisha Denise Farrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?