Holden et al v. United States District Court Southern District Of Georgia Probation Office
Plaintiff: Thomas Holden and Rachel Holden
Defendant: United States District Court Southern District Of Georgia Probation Office
Case Number: 2:2018cv00128
Filed: October 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' Consent #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs shall have until December 31, 2018, to file their response to Defendant's motion to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 12/19/2018. (csr)
December 19, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 12/31/2018. (csr)
December 17, 2018 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to December 31, 2018, by Thomas Holden. Responses due by 12/31/2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Burke, Robert)
December 17, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to December 31, 2018. (csr)
December 3, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by United States District Court Southern District Of Georgia Probation Office. Responses due by 12/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exh. A - Judiciary Regulations)(Leithart, Otto)
November 15, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Otto Woelke Leithart on behalf of United States District Court Southern District Of Georgia Probation Office. (Leithart, Otto) Modified on 11/15/2018 (csr).
November 14, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rachel Holden, Thomas Holden re: #1 Complaint. Sheriff's Entry of Service. (Christie, Carrie) Modified on 11/14/2018 (csr).
November 14, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: United States District Court Southern District Of Georgia Probation Office answer due 1/7/2019. (csr)
October 25, 2018 Filing 4 Entered in error (Rule 26 Order not required) - attorney was notified by email. Modified on 10/25/2018 (ca).
October 25, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United States District Court Southern District Of Georgia Probation Office. (ca)
October 25, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Rachel Holden, Thomas Holden. (ca)
October 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States District Court Southern District Of Georgia Probation Office, filed by Rachel Holden, Thomas Holden. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(ca)
October 25, 2018 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 113J-2471074. (ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holden et al v. United States District Court Southern District Of Georgia Probation Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States District Court Southern District Of Georgia Probation Office
Represented By: Otto Woelke Leithart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Holden
Represented By: Robert H. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Holden
Represented By: Robert H. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?