United States of America v. Dineen

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Frank T. Dineen
Case Number: 2:2018cv00131
Filed: October 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Frank T. Dineen. (ca)
November 30, 2018 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Frank T. Dineen waiver sent on 11/1/2018, answer due 12/31/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Waiver of Service Frank T. Dineen)(Bahnsen, Nicholas)
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 Litigants' Bill of Rights by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Appendix LR 16.7 Litigants' Bill of Rights)(Bahnsen, Nicholas)
October 31, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Frank T. Dineen. (slt)
October 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Reduce Tax Assessment to Judgment against Frank T. Dineen, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(slt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Dineen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank T. Dineen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Otto Woelke Leithart
Represented By: Nicholas Scott Bahnsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?