Thompson Supermarket, Inc. v. American Zurich Ins., Co.

Plaintiff: Thompson Supermarket, Inc.
Defendant: American Zurich Ins., Co.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00017
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re: #8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Thompson Supermarket, Inc. Accordingly, all claims asserted in this action are dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own fees and costs. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close this case. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 3/7/2019. (csr)
February 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Thompson Supermarket, Inc. (Phelps, Joseph)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by American Zurich Ins., Co. Responses due by 3/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)(Ferrand, Frederick) Modified on 2/19/2019 (csr).
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph L. Phelps, III on behalf of Thompson Supermarket, Inc. (Phelps, Joseph)
February 7, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motion to Appear PHV due by 2/16/2019. (slt)
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by American Zurich Ins., Co.(Ferrand, Frederick) Modified on 2/7/2019 (jlh).
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 REMOVAL NOTICE to all Counsel of Record re #1 Notice of Removal. Plaintiff's Counsel intending to appear in the referenced matter must file a Notice of Appearance or Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice no later than ten (10) days after the issuance of this notice. (ca)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 2/6/2019. (ca)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of Wayne County, case number SUCV2019000014. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113J-2535073), filed by American Zurich Ins., Co.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, Complaint for Damages, Exhibit A, Exhibit B, #2 General Civil and Domestic Relations Case Filing, #3 Sheriff's Entry of Service, #4 Answer of Defendant American Zurich Insurance Company, #5 Defendnat's Notice of Filing Removal, #6 Defendant's Notice of Filing Removal with Exhibit A, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson Supermarket, Inc. v. American Zurich Ins., Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Zurich Ins., Co.
Represented By: Frederick Owen Ferrand
Represented By: Sabrina Lynn Atkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thompson Supermarket, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph L. Phelps, III
Represented By: Robert B. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?