Blake v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Katherine Elaine Blake
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Undetermined: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv00022
Filed: February 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Nancy A. Berryhill answer due 6/16/2019. (ca)
March 25, 2019 Filing 9 U.S. Marshal Return as to Nancy A. Berryhill on 3/11/19; Attorney General of the U.S. on 3/11/19, signed by E. Sase; U.S. Attorney for the SDGA on 3/8/19, signed by K. Daniel for #1 Complaint, #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (ca)
March 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon Heath Statkus on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill. (Statkus, Shannon) Modified on 3/13/2019 (ca).
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Karl E. Osterhout. Robert Rosenblum has entered an appearance in this case and vouches he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as this Court's Local Rule 83.4 requires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on February 26, 2019. (edd)
February 21, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Karl E. Osterhout. (ca)
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Karl E. Osterhout. Receipt Number 113J-2545279, Fee Amount $200, by Katherine Elaine Blake. Responses due by 3/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Supplemental List of Court Admissions, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Rosenblum, Robert) Modified on 2/21/2019 (ca).
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The U.S. Marshal is hereby directed to serve a copy of the Complaint and a copy of this Order upon Defendant, the Attorney General of the U.S., and the U.S. Attorney for the SDGA without prepayment of costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 2/21/2019. (ca) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/21/2019: #1 Prepared 285 forms) (ca). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/4/2019: #2 Prepared 285 - Berryhill) (ca).
February 18, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Submitted: waiting for ruling on Motion to Proceed IFP. (ca)
February 18, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Katherine Elaine Blake. (ca)
February 18, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Katherine Elaine Blake. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(ca)
February 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill, filed by Katherine Elaine Blake. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blake v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Elaine Blake
Represented By: Robert Rosenblum
Represented By: Karl E Osterhout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Shannon Heath Statkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?