Sugartown Worldwide LLC v. KK's Enterprises of Georgia, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Sugartown Worldwide LLC
Defendant: KK's Enterprises of Georgia, Inc. and Brandi McDonald
Case Number: 2:2019cv00036
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Entry of Permanent Injunction on Consent by Sugartown Worldwide LLC. Responses due by 7/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Beaton, Theresa)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by James A. Trigg. Theresa D. Beaton has entered an appearance in this case and vouches she will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as this Court's Local Rule 83.4 requires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on July 3, 2019. (edd)
July 2, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of James A. Trigg (slt)
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of James A. Trigg Receipt Number 113J-2634365, Fee Amount $200, by Sugartown Worldwide LLC. Responses due by 7/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Certificate Good Standing)(Beaton, Theresa)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Stay. The deadline for the parties to conduct their Rule 26(f) conference is stayed until the parties reach a final agreement or until June 27, 2019 should the parties be unable to reach a final agreement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 5/22/19. (slt)
May 20, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #9 Joint MOTION to Stay Deadline to Conduct Rule 26(f) Conference. (slt)
May 20, 2019 Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Stay Deadline to Conduct Rule 26(f) Conference by Sugartown Worldwide LLC. Responses due by 6/3/2019. (Beaton, Theresa)
April 17, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by KK's Enterprises of Georgia, Inc., Brandi McDonald. (McIlvaine, James)
April 16, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by KK's Enterprises of Georgia, Inc., Brandi McDonald.(McIlvaine, James)
March 28, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: KK's Enterprises of Georgia, Inc. answer due 4/16/2019. Brandi McDonald answer due 4/16/2019. (slt)
March 28, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on KK's Enterprises of Georgia, Inc. on 03/26/2019, filed by Sugartown Worldwide LLC. (Beaton, Theresa)
March 28, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Brandi McDonald on 03/26/2019, filed by Sugartown Worldwide LLC. (Beaton, Theresa)
March 20, 2019 Filing fee: $400.00, receipt number 113J-2564359. (csr)
March 20, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (csr)
March 20, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Sugartown Worldwide LLC. $400.00 Filing Fee - Receipt Number: 113J-2564359. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet). (csr) Modified on 3/20/2019 (slt).
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sugartown Worldwide LLC identifying Oxford Industries, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (Beaton, Theresa)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 3/20/2019. (csr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sugartown Worldwide LLC v. KK's Enterprises of Georgia, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sugartown Worldwide LLC
Represented By: Theresa Davis Beaton
Represented By: James A. Trigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KK's Enterprises of Georgia, Inc.
Represented By: James Wrixam McIlvaine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandi McDonald
Represented By: James Wrixam McIlvaine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?