Thorpe v. TitleMax of Georgia, Inc. et al
Trustee: Office of the U.S. Trustee
Appellant: Oletta Thorpe
Appellee: TitleMax of Georgia, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00054
Filed: April 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 BRIEF by Oletta Thorpe. (Cabiness, R.)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/07/2018, before Judge Michele J. Kim. Court Reporter/Transcriber Victoria L. Root, Telephone number 912-650-4066. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. (Transcript Redaction Policy Issued or Click here to view #Transcript Redaction Policy) Redaction Request due 6/26/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/6/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/3/2019. (USBC-Bergen, Janet)
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/11/2018, before Judge Michele J. Kim. Court Reporter/Transcriber Victoria L. Root, Telephone number 912-650-4066. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. (Transcript Redaction Policy Issued or Click here to view #Transcript Redaction Policy) Redaction Request due 6/24/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/4/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/1/2019. (USBC-Bergen, Janet)
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. Appellant Brief due by 6/8/2019. (slt)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 Transmittal of Bankruptcy Record Appellant Brief due by 6/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appellant Designation, #2 Record on Appeal) (USBC-Bergen, Janet) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/9/2019: #3 Appellant's Statement of Issues on Appeal) (slt). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/9/2019: #4 NOTICE OF TRANSMITTAL (CORRECTED FORMAT)) (slt).
April 23, 2019 Entered in Error *** Set/Reset Deadlines: Appellant Brief due by 5/23/2019. (slt) Modified on 4/25/2019 (slt).
April 23, 2019 Filing 2 Entered in Error *** NOTICE of docketing #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. Appellant brief due. 5/23/19. (slt) Modified on 4/25/2019 (slt).
April 23, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 18-20082-MJK. File received, filed by Oletta Thorpe. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Appellant, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(slt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thorpe v. TitleMax of Georgia, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Office of the U.S. Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Oletta Thorpe
Represented By: R. Flay Cabiness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: TitleMax of Georgia, Inc.
Represented By: Charles J. Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?