Smith, et al v. HSBC Bank USA, et al
Appellant: Sharon H. Smith and Marvin B. Smith, III
Appellee: HSBC Bank USA, National Association, HSBC Bank USA, N.A. and HSBC Bank USA
Trustee: R. Michael Souther
Case Number: 2:2019cv00076
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE and Clerk's Certification of Service re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. Appellants' Brief due by 8/31/2019. (slt)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 Transmittal of Bankruptcy Record (PART 4) Appellant Brief due by 8/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 docs 740 - 744, #2 Adv. Proc. 17-02016 docs 1 - 29, #3 docs 30 - 32, #4 docs 34 - 38) (USBC-Bergen, Janet)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 Transmittal of Bankruptcy Record (PART 3) Appellant Brief due by 8/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 doc 738) (USBC-Bergen, Janet)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 Transmittal of Bankruptcy Record (PART 2) Appellant Brief due by 8/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 docs 699 - 732, #2 docs 734 - 736) (USBC-Bergen, Janet)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 Transmittal of Bankruptcy Record (PART 1) Appellant Brief due by 8/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 case docket, #2 Designation of contents, #3 Claim No. 10, #4 docs 154 - 648, #5 doc 650 (STRICKEN), #6 doc 651 - 652 (STRICKEN), #7 doc 653 (STRICKEN)) (USBC-Bergen, Janet)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 07-20244. File received, filed by Sharon H. Smith, Marvin B. Smith, III. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Transmital, #2 Order of Dismissal with Prejudice, #3 Docket Sheet, #4 Notice to Appellant Regarding Designation of Record)(ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith, et al v. HSBC Bank USA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Sharon H. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Marvin B. Smith, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HSBC Bank USA, National Association
Represented By: Jennifer R. Burbine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Represented By: Jennifer R. Burbine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HSBC Bank USA
Represented By: Jennifer R. Burbine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: R. Michael Souther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?