Old Republic General Insurance Corporation v. Ceres Environmental Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Old Republic General Insurance Corporation
Defendant: David Allison, Glynn County Airport Commission, Ceres Environmental Services, Inc., Sharon Allison and Glynn County, Georgia
Case Number: 2:2019cv00083
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 13 CORRECTED FILING OF ANSWER to Complaint by Glynn County, Georgia.(Dix, Karl)
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 CORRECTED FILING OF ANSWER to Complaint by Glynn County Airport Commission.(Dix, Karl)
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Glynn County, Georgia.(Dix, Karl)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Glynn County Airport Commission.(Dix, Karl)
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Ceres Environmental Services, Inc.. (Dix, Karl)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by Ceres Environmental Services, Inc..(Miller, Garrett)
August 12, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Glynn County Airport Commission answer due 8/26/2019; Glynn County, Georgia answer due 8/26/2019. (ca)
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Old Republic General Insurance Corporation. (Leet, Nicole)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing by Old Republic General Insurance Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Leet, Nicole)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing by Old Republic General Insurance Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Leet, Nicole)
July 30, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Ceres Environmental Services, Inc. answer due 8/13/2019. (ca)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing by Old Republic General Insurance Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Leet, Nicole)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (csr)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 7/11/2019. (csr)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against All Defendants, filed by Old Republic General Insurance Corporation. $400.00 Filing Fee Paid - Receipt Number: 113J-2638823. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet). (csr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Old Republic General Insurance Corporation v. Ceres Environmental Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glynn County Airport Commission
Represented By: Karl Dix, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ceres Environmental Services, Inc.
Represented By: Garrett E. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glynn County, Georgia
Represented By: Karl Dix, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Old Republic General Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Nicole C. Leet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?