COUCH v. APPLING ITF et al
Plaintiff: JEFFREY HOYT COUCH
Defendant: COUNSELOR DEBRA CLARY, SAWS, Stephanie Mercer, Stan Shepard, Black, APPLING ITF and Dr. Cheney
Case Number: 2:2019cv00100
Filed: August 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Brunswick Office
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of #9 Case Transferred In - District Transfer, #1 Complaint. (ca)
August 21, 2019 Filing 9 Case transfer in from District of Georgia Middle; Case Number 5:19-cv-00209. Case transferred electronically
August 20, 2019 Case Electronically Transferred Out - District Transfer to Southern District of Georgia. All documents, including a certified copy of the docket sheet and pleading were transferred electronically. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**Case Transfer Acknowledgment deadline 9/3/2019. (ans)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, and DENYING #5 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Plaintiff's claims against the GDC are DISMISSED without prejudice; and ORDER OF TRANSFER: The Clerk of Court is ORDERED to transfer this action to the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Georgia - Brunswick Division. The Clerk shall forward a copy of this Order to the business manager of the facility in which Plaintiff is incarcerated so that withdrawals from his account may commence as payment towards the filing fee. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 8/20/2019. (kat)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 EXHIBIT(S) by JEFFREY HOYT COUCH re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Health Services Request Form)(vs)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(vs)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Filed by JEFFREY HOYT COUCH. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(ans)
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to JEFFREY HOYT COUCH (ans)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (ans)
May 31, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by JEFFREY HOYT COUCH. (Attachments: #1 Trust Account Statement). Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(ans)
May 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants,filed by JEFFREY HOYT COUCH. (Attachments: #1 Health Services Request Forms, #2 Receipts for Grievance at Counselor's Level, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Envelope)(ans)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COUCH v. APPLING ITF et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNSELOR DEBRA CLARY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAWS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Mercer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stan Shepard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APPLING ITF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Cheney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY HOYT COUCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?