Gowen et al v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Ashley Gowen and Andy Gowen
Defendant: John Doe and/or Jane Doe 1-6 and Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00111
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Restriction/Return of Discovery Related Materials re #13 Disclosure Statement Local Rule 7.1.1. (ca)
November 7, 2019 Filing 13 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Andy Gowen, Ashley Gowen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachments A-E)(Musgrove, J.)
October 30, 2019 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (McMullen, Melissa)
October 29, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Musgrove, J.)
October 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Benjamin Musgrove on behalf of Andy Gowen and Ashley Gowen. (csr)
September 20, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiffs' counsel must comply with #9 Order, by 10/17/2019. (MG)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time; granting #8 Motion to Stay. Case stayed until October 16, 2019, at which time this stay will be automatically lifted. The Court DIRECTS Plaintiffs' counsel to notify the Court on or before October 17, 2019 regarding his status as a member of this Court's Bar or whether he still seeks to appear in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 09/20/2019. (MG) Modified on 9/21/2019 (slt).
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Enter an Appearance, and Temporary Stay of Proceedings re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Andy and Ashley Gowen. Responses due by 10/1/2019. (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order). REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. (csr)
September 11, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Notice of Appearance or Motion for Admission for Pro Hac Vice due by 9/21/2019. (csr)
September 11, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Re-file Any Pending Motions Previously Filed in State Court due by 9/25/2019. (csr)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE To All Counsel Of Record re: #1 Notice of Removal. (csr)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 9/11/2019. (csr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/11/2019: #1 Correct Attachment) (csr).
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Melissa C. Patton re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (csr)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (csr)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 VERIFICATION re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (csr)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (csr)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company from Superior Court of Camden County, Georgia, case number SUCV-2019-00070. (Filing fee paid on 9/11/2019; $ 400 receipt number 113J-2680342) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons, Complaint, Insurance Policy, Endorsement, Home Replacement Card, Privacy Statement, #2 Exhibit B - Claim Status, #3 Exhibit C - Estimate, #4 Exhibit D - Letter - Property Study, #5 Exhibit E - Letter - Structural Roof Assessment, #6 Exhibit F - Proposal, #7 Exhibit G - Letter - National Catastrophe Team, #8 Exhibit H - Claim Status, #9 Exhibit I - Donny Ryals Roof Repair Proposal, Copy of Checks, #10 Exhibit J - Copy of Checks, #11 Exhibit K - Estimate from Sam Pickrens Air & Insulation, #12 Exhibit L - Estimate from Terry Stover Construction, Inc., #13 Exhibit M - Copies of Checks, #14 Exhibit N - Estimate from Hippo Storage Center, #15 Exhibit O - Invoices, #16 Exhibit P - Invoice from Coastal Floors & Copy of Check, #17 Exhibit Q - Invoice from Cumberland Services, LLC & Copy of Check, #18 Exhibit R - Copy of Check, #19 Exhibit S - Invoice and Copy of Check, #20 Exhibit T - Invoice from Marble Today, Inc & Copy of Check, #21 Exhibit U - BMC Order Acknowledgment, #22 Exhibit V - Statement & Copy of Check).(csr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/11/2019: #23 Civil Cover Sheet) (csr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gowen et al v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Gowen
Represented By: J. Benjamin Musgrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andy Gowen
Represented By: J. Benjamin Musgrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe and/or Jane Doe 1-6
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Represented By: Melissa Cordell Patton
Represented By: Melissa Cordell McMullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?