Lee v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ruthie Lee
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00140
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #12 Response filed by Ruthie Lee, #11 Order on Motion to Dismiss filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. (Chaness, Bret)
December 30, 2019 Filing 13 ******* MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. Responses due by 1/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Briefs Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit "A" Security Deed, #3 Exhibit "B" Assignments)(Chaness, Bret)
December 27, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to #11 Order on Motion to Dismiss filed by Ruthie Lee. (Adams, W.)
December 20, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance re #11 Order due by 12/27/2019. (ca)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying as moot #4 Motion to Dismiss the original Complaint. Plaintiff is ORDERED to set forth the basis for federal jurisdiction within seven (7) days of today's date. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 12/20/2019. (ca)
December 17, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., filed by Ruthie Lee.(Adams, W.)
December 10, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 12/17/2019. (ca)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Stay. All deadlines will be stayed until further order of the court. Plaintiff is permitted to amend her complaint within seven (7) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 12/10/2019. (ca)
December 10, 2019 Motions No Longer Referred: #5 MOTION to Stay re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Pretrial Deadlines. (ca)
December 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Douglas Adams on behalf of Ruthie Lee (Adams, W.)
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #3 REMOVAL NOTICE To All Counsel of Record. (Set/Reset Deadlines: Entry of Appearance or Notice of Compliance, on behalf of Plaintiff, due by 12/10/2019). (MG)
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Exhibit A to Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" Security Deed)(Chaness, Bret)
November 20, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #5 MOTION to Stay re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Pretrial Deadlines. (ca)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 ******* MOTION to Stay re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Pretrial Deadlines by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. Responses due by 12/4/2019. (Attachments: #1Brief in Support of Motion to Stay Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Text of Proposed Order on Motion to Stay Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines)(Chaness, Bret) Modified on 11/20/2019 (ca).
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. Responses due by 12/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Briefs Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit "A" Security Deed, #3 Exhibit "B" Assignments)(Chaness, Bret)
November 13, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. answer due 11/20/2019. (ca)
November 13, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance: Notice of Appearance - Plaintiff due by 11/23/2019. (ca)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 REMOVAL NOTICE To All Counsel of Record re #1 Notice of Removal. Set/Reset Deadlines: Pending Motions due by 11/27/2019. (ca)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 11/13/2019. (ca)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of Glynn County, Georgia, case number CE19-00893. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113J-2723814), filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons, Complaint, Sheriff's Entry of Service, Order, Entry of Appearance, Order, Recusal Order, #2 Exhibit B - Security Deed, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ca) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/13/2019: #4 Exhibit C - Tax Assessor's Record) (ca).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruthie Lee
Represented By: W. Douglas Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Bret Jacob Chaness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?