Singleton v. Biegel et al
Plaintiff: Latrezz Singleton
Defendant: Corporal Malone, Officer Biegel and Sargeant Vallejo
Case Number: 2:2020cv00014
Filed: February 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2020 Filing 7 Letter from Latrezz Singleton. (Attachment: #1 Envelope). (csr)
March 26, 2020 Filing fee payment received, Amount $14.00, Receipt BWK009170. (csr)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Latrezz Singleton. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 3/16/20. (slt)
March 13, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT by Prisoner Latrezz Singleton to collection of fees. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (MG)
March 13, 2020 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Latrezz Singleton. (Attachments: #1 Resident Transactions, #2 Envelope) (MG)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. PLRA due by 4/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 3/3/2020. (ca)
February 21, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Latrezz Singleton. Responses due by 3/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Resident Transactions, #2 Envelope) REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. (MG)
February 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Latrezz Singleton. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Grievance Detail Report, #2 Letter, #3 Envelope)(MG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singleton v. Biegel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latrezz Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporal Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Biegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sargeant Vallejo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?