The Onionman Company, LLC et al v. Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Vidalia Organics, Inc., The Onionman Company, LLC and Shad J. Dasher
Defendant: Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00018
Filed: February 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 Filing 11 Brief in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company. (Ball, Mallory)
March 16, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Intent to File a Reply Brief in Support of Its Motion by Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company re #9 Response in Opposition to #5 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support. (Ball, Mallory) Modified on 3/16/2020 (csr).
March 16, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Shad J. Dasher. (Jones, Billy)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting the parties' Joint #7 Motion to Stay all discovery deadlines pending the resolution of #5 Defendant's motion to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 3/11/2020. (csr)
March 6, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 Consent MOTION to Stay Discovery. (csr)
March 6, 2020 Filing 7 Consent MOTION to Stay Discovery by Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company. Responses due by 3/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ball, Mallory)
March 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Exhibit A, filed by Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support. (Ball, Mallory) Modified on 3/3/2020 (csr).
March 2, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support by Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company. Responses due by 3/16/2020. (Ball, Mallory)
February 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Billy N. Jones on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jones, Billy)
February 25, 2020 Set Deadline: Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company answer due 3/3/2020. (ca)
February 25, 2020 Set Deadlines: Pending Motions due by 3/10/2020. (ca)
February 25, 2020 Filing 3 REMOVAL NOTICE To All Counsel Of Record re #1 Notice of Removal. Set Deadlines: Compliance: Notice of Appearance due by 3/6/2020. (ca)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 2/25/2020. (ca)
February 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company from Superior Court of Long County, Georgia, case number SUV2020000008. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113J-2789744). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons, Complaint for Declaratory Judgment, Sheriff's Entry of Service, Farm Property (Nationwide Agribusiness), Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ca) Modified on 2/25/2020 (ca).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Onionman Company, LLC et al v. Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company
Represented By: Philip W. Savrin
Represented By: Mallory Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vidalia Organics, Inc.
Represented By: Billy N. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Onionman Company, LLC
Represented By: Billy N. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shad J. Dasher
Represented By: Billy N. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?