Jenkins v. Geter et al
Petitioner: Travis Lavoy Jenkins
Respondent: Linda Geter and United States Of America
Case Number: 2:2020cv00027
Filed: March 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2020 Filing fee: $5.00, receipt number BWK009177 (Fee was originally paid in case 2:18-cv-136 on 3/27/20. Case 2:18-cv-136 was closed on 5/2/19. The $5.00 filing fee is being applied to case 2:20-cv-27.) (slt)
April 20, 2020 Filing 4 RESPONSE TO ORDER in reference to #3 Order to Show Cause filed by Travis Lavoy Jenkins. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(slt)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #2 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency. (Show Cause Response due by 5/1/2020.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 04/10/2020. (MG)
March 11, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (Compliance due by 4/1/2020.) (MG)
March 11, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Travis Lavoy Jenkins. (Attachments: #1 Request for Withdrawal of Inmate's Personal Funds, #2 Inmate Inquiry, #3 Envelope) (MG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jenkins v. Geter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Travis Lavoy Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Linda Geter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?