Owners Insurance Company v. Endicott Buck-Cadillac Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Owners Insurance Company
Defendant: James Brooms and Endicott Buck-Cadillac Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2020cv00056
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2020 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Endicott Buck-Cadillac Incorporated. (Lindberg, C.)
July 24, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Endicott Buck-Cadillac Incorporated.(Lindberg, C.)
July 20, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Owners Insurance Company. Endicott Buck-Cadillac Incorporated served on 7/11/2020, answer due 8/1/2020. (Kendall, Michael)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael C. Kendall, II. Laura J. French has entered an appearance in this case and vouches she will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as this Court's Local Rule 83.4 requires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on July 7, 2020. (edd)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael C. Kendall. Laura J. French has entered an appearance in this case and vouches she will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as this Court's Local Rule 83.4 requires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on July 7, 2020. (edd)
July 2, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael C. Kendall, II Receipt Number AGASDC-2873931, Fee Amount $200. (MG)
July 2, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael C. Kendall, II Receipt Number AGASDC-2873931, Fee Amount $200, by Owners Insurance Company. Responses due by 7/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing (Michael C. Kendall, II), #2 Text of Proposed Order)(French, Laura) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/2/2020: #3 Statement of Cases) (MG).
July 1, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number AGASDC-2873128, Fee Amount $200. (MG)
July 1, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number AGASDC-2873128, Fee Amount $200, by Owners Insurance Company. Responses due by 7/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kendall, Michael)
July 1, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (MG)
July 1, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Submitted (French, Laura) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/1/2020: #1 Main Document- Corrected) (MG).
July 1, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Submitted (French, Laura) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/1/2020: #1 Main Document- Corrected) (MG).
July 1, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Submitted (French, Laura) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/1/2020: #1 Main Document- Corrected) (MG).
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 6/5/2020. (ca)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to James Brooms, Endicott Buck-Cadillac Incorporated. (ca)
June 4, 2020 Filing fee: $400, receipt number AGASDC-2856241. (ca)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants, filed by Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit C - Redacted, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(ca) Modified on 6/5/2020 (ca).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owners Insurance Company v. Endicott Buck-Cadillac Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Brooms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endicott Buck-Cadillac Incorporated
Represented By: C. Foster Lindberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Laura Jones French
Represented By: Michael C. Kendall, II
Represented By: Michael C. Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?