HANSON v. GA DREAMWORKS REALTY LLC
Plaintiff: Edward Hanson
Defendant: GA DREAMWORKS REALTY LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00061
Filed: June 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing re #14 Case Transferred In - District Transfer. Set Deadlines: Compliance: Applications PHV due by 6/23/2020. (ca)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 6/9/2020. (ca)
June 9, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE To All Counsel Of Record re #14 Case Transferred In - District Transfer. (ca)
June 9, 2020 Filing 14 Case transfer in from District of Georgia Middle; Case Number 5:20-cv-00104. Case transferred electronically
June 9, 2020 Case Electronically Transferred Out - District Transfer to Georgia Southern. All documents, including a certified copy of the docket sheet and pleading were transferred electronically. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**Case Transfer Acknowledgment deadline 6/23/2020. (vs)
June 8, 2020 Filing 13 This is a text only entry; no document issued.ORDER terminating #4 Motion to Dismiss Complaint; granting #12 Motion to Transfer Case. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 6/8/20. (hmc)
June 3, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Transfer Case by EDWARD HANSON (LIEBOWITZ, RICHARD) Modified on 6/4/2020 to change event type (vs).
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by RICHARD LIEBOWITZ (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (nop)
June 1, 2020 Filing 10 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by EDWARD HANSON Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3477559, $100. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Certificate of Good Standing)(LIEBOWITZ, RICHARD)
May 15, 2020 SECOND NOTICE TO COUNSEL RICHARD LIEBOWITZ - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. (vs)
May 15, 2020 Filing 9 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File RESPONSE to #4 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint. The response shall be filed no later than 6/5/2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 5/15/2020. (hmc)
May 14, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE filed by GA DREAMWORKS REALTY LLC re #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File RESPONSE as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Complaint, : (SMITH, JAY)
May 14, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for an extension of time to file Pro Hac Vice Petition and MOTION for Extension of Time to File RESPONSE as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Complaint, : by EDWARD HANSON filed by RICHARD LIEBOWITZ.(LIEBOWITZ, RICHARD) Modified on 5/15/2020 to add docket text(vs).
April 24, 2020 Filing 6 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response and to File Motion to Proceed Pro Hac Vice until 5/15/20. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 4/24/2020. (hmc)
April 23, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File RESPONSE as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Complaint, : by EDWARD HANSON filed by RICHARD LIEBOWITZ.(LIEBOWITZ, RICHARD)
April 10, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Complaint, : by GA DREAMWORKS REALTY LLC filed by JAY HOLDER SMITH, JR. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Request for Oral Argument)(SMITH, JAY)
April 10, 2020 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RICHARD LIEBOWITZ - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. (vs)
March 17, 2020 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to EDWARD HANSON (vs)
March 17, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to GA DREAMWORKS REALTY LLC. (vs)
March 17, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by EDWARD HANSON ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. NO NEED TO REFILE. (vs)
March 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GA DREAMWORKS REALTY, LLC Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3418641, $400 filed by EDWARD HANSON, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Photos, #2 Exhibit B - Screenshots of the Photographs on the Websites, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Copyright Form)(LIEBOWITZ, RICHARD) Modified on 3/17/2020 to add Exhibits description (vs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HANSON v. GA DREAMWORKS REALTY LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GA DREAMWORKS REALTY LLC
Represented By: JAY HOLDER SMITH, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Hanson
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?