Austin et al v. Glynn County, Georgia
Plaintiff: Ernest Fuller, III and Langston Austin
Defendant: Glynn County, Georgia and E. Neal Jump
Case Number: 2:2020cv00073
Filed: July 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Brunswick Office
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Intent to File Reply Brief by Langston Austin, Ernest Fuller, III re #13 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. (Van Remmen, Gordon)
August 26, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Intent to File Reply by Glynn County, Georgia, E. Neal Jump re #11 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter Jurisdiction). (Hancock, Emily)
August 26, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Glynn County, Georgia, E. Neal Jump. (Hancock, Emily)
August 18, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter Jurisdiction) filed by Langston Austin, Ernest Fuller, III. (Lampros, Peter)
August 13, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #13 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. (ca)
August 12, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Langston Austin, Ernest Fuller, III. Responses due by 8/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Proposed Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2- Redline Comparison of First Amended Complaint to Proposed Second Amended Complaint)(Van Remmen, Gordon)
August 12, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Langston Austin, Ernest Fuller, III. E. Neal Jump served on 8/7/2020, answer due 8/28/2020. (Van Remmen, Gordon)
August 4, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss #7 Amended Complaint. MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter Jurisdiction) filed by Glynn County, Georgia, E. Neal Jump. Responses due by 8/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Collective Action Complaint)(Strickland, Richard) Modified on 8/5/2020 (csr).
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying as moot #5 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 08/04/2020. (MG)
July 31, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to E. Neal Jump. (ca)
July 31, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Submitted (Lampros, Peter)
July 31, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Langston Austin, Ernest Fuller, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lampros, Peter)
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Gordon Gerhard Van Remmen, II on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Van Remmen, Gordon)
July 30, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by Glynn County, Georgia. Responses due by 8/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismisss)(Strickland, Richard) Modified on 7/31/2020 (jlh).
July 15, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Langston Austin, Ernest Fuller, III. All Defendants. (Lampros, Peter)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 7/7/2020. (ca)
July 7, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Glynn County, Georgia. (ca)
July 6, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number AGASDC-2874839. (ca)
July 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Langston Austin, Ernest Fuller, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Austin et al v. Glynn County, Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glynn County, Georgia
Represented By: Richard K. Strickland
Represented By: Aaron W. Mumford
Represented By: Emily Rose Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Neal Jump
Represented By: Richard K. Strickland
Represented By: Aaron W. Mumford
Represented By: Emily Rose Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Fuller, III
Represented By: Thomas A. Withers
Represented By: Joseph Richard Padgett
Represented By: Peter Andrew Lampros
Represented By: Gordon Gerhard Van Remmen, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Langston Austin
Represented By: Thomas A. Withers
Represented By: Joseph Richard Padgett
Represented By: Peter Andrew Lampros
Represented By: Gordon Gerhard Van Remmen, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?