Dollar v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Janice Theresa Dollar
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00078
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (JH)
August 21, 2020 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Four proposed procedural orders, #2 Exhibit 2 Plaintiff Fact Sheet and authorizations)(Custer, William)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brett S. Covington. William V. Custer has entered an appearance in this case and vouches he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as this Court's Local Rule 83.4 requires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on July 29, 2020. (edd)
July 28, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing by Monsanto Company re #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Brett S. Covington Receipt Number AGASDC-2890046, Fee Amount $200, Statement of Brett S. Covington in Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statement in Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Custer, William)
July 28, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER by Janice Theresa Dollar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Rule 26 Instruction Order)(Brooks, Todd) Modified on 7/28/2020 (csr).
July 28, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Brett S. Covington. Receipt Number AGASDC-2890046, Fee Amount $200.00 (csr)
July 27, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Brett S. Covington Receipt Number AGASDC-2890046, Fee Amount $200, by Monsanto Company. Responses due by 8/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing from U.S. District Court District of Maryland, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order of Admission)(Custer, William)
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd C. Brooks on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Brooks, Todd)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Monsanto Company.(Custer, William)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 7/17/2020. (ca)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 REMOVAL NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. Set Deadlines: Compliance: Notice of Appearance - Plaintiff due by 7/27/2020. Pending Motions due by 7/31/2020. (ca)
July 16, 2020 Set Deadlines: Monsanto Company answer due 7/23/2020. (ca)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Monsanto Company. (ca)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Monsanto Company from Superior Court of Glynn County, Georgia, case number CE20-00632. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGASDC-2882852). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons, Complaint, Death Certificate, Letters Testamentary #2 Exhibit 2 - Petitions for Year's Support, Acknowledgment of Services and Consent to Award of Year's Support, Exhibit "A" Schedule of Real and Personal Property, Notice of Petition to File for Year's Support, Final Order, Petition to Probate Will in Solemn Form, Acknowledgments of Service and Assent to Probate Instanter, Order Admitting Will to Probate in Solemn Form, Oath, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dollar v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Theresa Dollar
Represented By: Todd C. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: William V. Custer
Represented By: Brett S. Covington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?