King v. Geter
Petitioner: Rufus Lee King, Jr.
Respondent: Linda Geter
Case Number: 2:2020cv00079
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #4 MOTION to Dismiss. (csr)
September 10, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Linda Geter. Responses due by 9/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Bryan Erickson w attchs)(Blanchard, Jason)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing USMS Service of Process re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus upon (1) the Attorney General of the United States; (2) the named Respondent; and (3) the civil process clerk at the office of the United States Attorney for the Southern District of Georgia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 08/03/2020. (Attachments: #1 USM-285 Forms) (MG)
July 22, 2020 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number BWK009779. (csr)
July 21, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, fee not paid . Compliance due by 8/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Blank IFP Forms)(MG)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Rufus Lee King, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(MG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Geter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Linda Geter
Represented By: Jason W. Blanchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rufus Lee King, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?