United States of America v. Esaw
Plaintiff: United States Of America
Defendant: Rayon D. Esaw
Case Number: 2:2020cv00106
Filed: October 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Brunswick Office
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD re #14 Case Transferred In - District Transfer. (Compliance- Pro Hac Vice Forms due by 10/24/2020.) (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Vice Forms) (MG)
October 14, 2020 Filing 14 Case transfer in from District of Alaska; Case Number 3:20-cv-00129. Case transferred electronically
October 13, 2020 Case transferred to Southern District of Georgia. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent electronically. (JLH, COURT STAFF) Modified on 10/13/2020 to clarify docket text (JLH, COURT STAFF).
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION TO THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF GEORGIA: The government's motion to dismiss at docket #11 * is DENIED. The 2241 action is transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Georgia. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 10/13/20. * This order is regarding dkt 86 in case 3:18-cr-00094-SLG. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER denying as moot without prejudice #2 Motion to Vacate (2255) in related case 3:18-cr-00094-SLG. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 10/9/2020. (SDW, COURT STAFF) Modified on 10/13/2020 to clarify docket text and indicate this is docket 88 in 3:18-cr-00094-SLG (JLH, COURT STAFF).
October 2, 2020 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion by Rayon D. Esaw re #8 Amended Motion to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 Converted to 28 U.S.C. 2241, Response to #11 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction & Agreement to Waive Collateral Attacks & Appeals (Weaver, Thomas). (JLH, COURT STAFF) Modified on 10/13/2020 to indicate this is docket 87 in 3:18-cr-00094-SLG (JLH, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction & Agreement to Waive Collateral Attacks & Appeal by USA as to Rayon D. Esaw. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(JLH, COURT STAFF) Modified on 10/13/2020 to indicate this is docket 86 in 3:18-cr-00094-SLG (JLH, COURT STAFF).
August 25, 2020 Docket Annotation re Transcripts: Transcripts order at dkt 10 are located at docket 85 in case 3:18-cr-00094-SLG. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
August 21, 2020 Filing 10 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by USA as to Rayon D. Esaw (Cavanaugh, Kelly) (JLH, COURT STAFF) Modified on 10/13/2020 to indicate this is docket 84 in 3:18-cr-00094-SLG (JLH, COURT STAFF).
July 23, 2020 Filing 9 SLG TEXT ORDER: An Amended Petition was filed in this case on July 22, 2020 (Docket 8 ), which converted the action to a motion brought under 28 U.S.C. 2241. The briefing schedule previously established at Docket 78 shall apply to the Amended Petition, such that the governments response to the motion is due on September 22, 2020. (JLH, COURT STAFF) Modified on 10/13/2020 to indicate this is docket 83 in 3:18-cr-00094-SLG (JLH, COURT STAFF).
July 22, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 Converted to 28 U.S.C. 2241 by Rayon D. Esaw. (Weaver, Thomas)(JLH, COURT STAFF) Modified on 10/13/2020 to indicate this is docket 82 in 3:18-cr-00094-SLG (JLH, COURT STAFF).
June 29, 2020 Docket Annotation re Transcripts: Transcripts ordered at dkt 7 are located at docket 81 in case 3:18-cr-00094-SLG. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
June 22, 2020 Filing 7 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Rayon D. Esaw (Weaver, Thomas) (JLH, COURT STAFF) Modified on 10/13/2020 to indicate this is docket 80 in 3:18-cr-00094-SLG (JLH, COURT STAFF).
June 9, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Thomas Eugene Weaver, Jr. appearing for Rayon D. Esaw. (JLH, COURT STAFF) Modified on 10/13/2020 to indicate this is docket 79 in 3:18-cr-00094-SLG (JLH, COURT STAFF).
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING SECTION 2255 PROCEEDING: This matter will not be referred to a Magistrate Judge. The Motion to Appoint Counsel, at docket #3 *, is GRANTED. The Federal Public Defenders shall designate counsel to represent Mr. Esaw. See Order for additional information and deadlines. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 6/8/20. * This order is regard dkt 76 in case 3:18-cr-00094-SLG. (JLH, COURT STAFF) Modified on 10/13/2020 to indicate this is docket 78 in 3:18-cr-00094-SLG (JLH, COURT STAFF).
June 4, 2020 Filing 4 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Rayon D. Esaw. (JLH, COURT STAFF) Modified on 10/13/2020 to indicate this is docket 77 in 3:18-cr-00094-SLG (JLH, COURT STAFF).
June 4, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Rayon D. Esaw.(JLH, COURT STAFF) Modified on 10/13/2020 to indicate this is docket 76 in 3:18-cr-00094-SLG (JLH, COURT STAFF).
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 by Rayon D. Esaw.(JLH, COURT STAFF) Modified on 10/13/2020 to indicate this is docket 75 in 3:18-cr-00094-SLG (JLH, COURT STAFF).
June 4, 2020 Docket Annotation: All future filings will be into 3:18-cr-00094-SLG. (PXS, COURT STAFF) Modified on 10/13/2020 in light of the filing of 2241 documents from motion to vacate in 3:18-cr-00094-SLG have been docketed in this case. (JLH, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Esaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rayon D. Esaw
Represented By: Thomas Eugene Weaver, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Of America
Represented By: Kelly A. Cavanaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?