Fredrick v. Watson et al
Plaintiff: Dante G. Fredrick
Defendant: Sheriff James K. Proctor, Major FNU Mastroianni and Sgt. Eric Watson
Case Number: 2:2020cv00121
Filed: November 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2021 Filing 33 MOTION for Extension of Time to File response by Dante G. Fredrick. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(slt)
January 4, 2021 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re #28 MOTION for Clarification filed by FNU Mastroianni, James K. Proctor, Eric Watson. (Choy, Sun)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS #22 of the Magistrate Judge as the opinion of the Court and DENIES as moot #4 Motion to Dismiss filed by FNU Mastroianni, Eric Watson, James K. Proctor. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 1/4/2021. (ca)
December 23, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION for Access to Court Order by Dante G. Fredrick. Responses due by 1/6/2021. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. (MG)
December 21, 2020 Filing 29 Omnibus MOTION to Consent by Decision of Plaintiff, MOTION of Court to Order Clerk to Mail Copies of all Pleadings filed by Defendants to Plaintiff by Dante G. Fredrick. Responses due by 1/4/2021. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. (MG)
December 21, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION for Clarification by Dante G. Fredrick. Responses due by 1/4/2021. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. (MG)
December 18, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #24 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law. Responses due by 1/1/2021. (ca)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER re #24 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file a response either opposing or indicating his lack of opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss within 14 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 12/18/2020. (ca)
December 17, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #26 MOTION to Stay re #2 Rule 26(f) Order and Incorporated Memorandum of Law. (ca)
December 17, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION to Stay re #2 Rule 26(f) Order and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by FNU Mastroianni, James K. Proctor, Eric Watson. Responses due by 12/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Choy, Sun)
December 16, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #24 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law. (ca)
December 16, 2020 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION for Referral for Criminal Investigation filed by FNU Mastroianni, James K. Proctor, Eric Watson. (Choy, Sun)
December 16, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by FNU Mastroianni, James K. Proctor, Eric Watson. Responses due by 12/30/2020. (Choy, Sun)
December 10, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Invoke Supplemental Jurisdiction by Dante G. Fredrick. Responses due by 12/24/2020. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. (MG)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that the Court deny as moot #4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by FNU Mastroianni, Eric Watson, James K. Proctor. To the extent Defendants wish to move to dismiss #21 FIRST Amended Complaint, Defendants may do so within 14 days of this Order and Report and Recommendation. Objections to R&R due by 12/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 12/07/2020. (MG)
December 7, 2020 Filing 21 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Dante G. Fredrick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(MG)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Amend/Correct and directs the Clerk of Court to create a separate docket entry for Document #15 as Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 12/07/2020. (MG)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying as premature Motions for Default Judgment #6 , #10 , denying as premature #7 Motion for Entry of Default, denying #9 Emergency Motion to Hold Defendants in Contempt, and denying #16 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 12/04/2020. (MG)
December 2, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by FNU Mastroianni, James K. Proctor, Eric Watson. (Choy, Sun)
December 2, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Referral for Criminal Investigation by Dante G. Fredrick. Responses due by 12/16/2020. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. (MG)
December 1, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Dante G. Fredrick. Responses due by 12/15/2020. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(ca)
December 1, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal, by Dante G. Fredrick. Responses due by 12/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(ca)
December 1, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by Dante G. Fredrick to #13 Response. (ca)
December 1, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by FNU Mastroianni, Eric Watson, James K. Proctor filed by Dante G. Fredrick. (ca)
November 20, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #12 MOTION to Stay Pretrial Deadlines and Discovery and Incorporated Memorandum of Law. (ca)
November 20, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay Pretrial Deadlines and Discovery and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by FNU Mastroianni, James K. Proctor, Eric Watson. Responses due by 12/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Choy, Sun)
November 20, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to hold defendants in contempt, #6 MOTION for Entry of Default, #7 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by FNU Mastroianni, James K. Proctor, Eric Watson. (Choy, Sun)
November 19, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Default Judgment by Dante G. Fredrick. Responses due by 12/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(ca)
November 19, 2020 Filing 9 EMERGENCY MOTION to hold defendants in contempt by Dante G. Fredrick. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(slt)
November 18, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE re #2 Rule 26(f) Order, and Attempt to Schedule Conference to Defendants of Civil Action, by Dante G. Fredrick. (MG)
November 18, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Entry of Default by Dante G. Fredrick. Responses due by 12/2/2020. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. (MG)
November 18, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Default Judgment as to by Dante G. Fredrick. Responses due by 12/2/2020. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. (MG) . Modified on 11/19/2020 (MG).
November 17, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law. Responses due by 12/1/2020. (MG)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file a response either opposing or indicating his lack of opposition within 14 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 11/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Fed.R.Civ.P. 12, #2 Fed.R.Civ.P. 41) (ca)
November 16, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law. (ca)
November 16, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by FNU Mastroianni, James K. Proctor, Eric Watson. Responses due by 11/30/2020. (Choy, Sun)
November 10, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: All Defendants Answer due 11/16/2020. Re-File Any Pending Motions Previously Filed in State Court due by 11/24/2020. (csr)
November 10, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE to All Counsel of Record re: #1 Notice of Removal. (csr)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 11/10/2020. (csr)
November 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Superior Court of Camden County, case number SUCV-2020-000899. (Filing fee paid on 11/9/2020 - $400 receipt number AGASDC-2961915). (Attachments: #1 Summonses, Inmate Form For Civil Action, Exhibit A, Exhibit B, Incident Reports, Exhibit C, Inmate Grievance Form, Declaration, Brief in support of, 2nd Exhibit A, 2nd Exhibit B, Declaration, Defendant's Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, Certificate of Service and Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (csr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fredrick v. Watson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff James K. Proctor
Represented By: Sun S. Choy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major FNU Mastroianni
Represented By: Sun S. Choy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Eric Watson
Represented By: Sun S. Choy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dante G. Fredrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?