Smith v. Davis
Plaintiff: Kenneth D. Smith
Defendant: Marshawn Y. Davis
Case Number: 2:2020cv00136
Filed: December 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying as moot #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 1/21/22. (slt)
January 22, 2021 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re: dismissing without prejudice #5 Amended Complaint filed by Kenneth D. Smith. It is further recommended that leave to appeal in forma pauperis be denied. Objections to R&R due by 2/5/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 1/22/21. (slt)
January 4, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kenneth D. Smith. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(ca)
January 4, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Marshawn Y. Davis, filed by Kenneth D. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(ca)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Plaintiff has 14 days from the date of this Order to correct the deficiencies in his filing. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to send Plaintiff a blank copy of an Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fee, and a blank copy of a non-prisoner complaint form. (Compliance due by 1/4/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 1/4/2021.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 12/21/2020. (ca)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 12/18/2020. (ca)
December 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kenneth D. Smith. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(ca)
December 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Marshawn Y. Davis, filed by Kenneth D. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshawn Y. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?