Stokes v. State of Georgia
Petitioner: Gerald Derrell Stokes
Respondent: State of Georgia
Not Classified By Court: Attorney General State of Georgia (Notice Only)
Case Number: 2:2021cv00050
Filed: May 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2021 Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge that the Court Dismiss without prejudice Stokes' 28 U.S.C. 2254 Amended Petition, Direct the Clerk of Court to Close this case and enter the appropriate judgment of dismissal, and Deny Stokes leave to appeal in forma pauperis and a Certificate of Appealability. Objections to R&R due by 8/5/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 7/22/2021. (csr)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER vacating the June 25, 2021 #7 Report and Recommendations. The Court orders Stokes to inform the Court within 14 days of this Order whether he wishes to proceed with the instant cause of action or pursue a 1983 cause of action. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to mail Stokes a blank 42 U.S.C. 1983 complaint form and a blank copy of the Court's preferred in forma pauperis form for use by prisoner-petitioners. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 7/2/2021. (ca)
July 2, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance re #8 due by 7/16/2021. (ca)
June 25, 2021 Filing 7 **Vacated on 7/2/21**REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS the Court dismiss without prejudice Stokes' #1 , #5 28 U.S.C. 2254 Amended Petition for failure to follow this Court's directive, and deny Stokes leave to appeal in forma pauperis and a Certificate of Appealability. Objections to R&R due by 7/9/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 6/25/2021. (ca) Modified on 7/2/2021 (ca).
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying Plaintiff's #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 6/25/2021. (ca)
June 25, 2021 Filing fee: $5.00, receipt number BWK010903. (csr)
June 8, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Gerald Derrell Stokes.(jrb)
May 26, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. After 14 days a notice of noncompliance will be submitted to a judicial officer for possible sanctions, to include dismissal. (ca)
May 26, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Non-payment of filing fee re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Failure to comply with this notice may result in dismissal by the Court. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 6/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 IFP form)(ca)
May 26, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Gerald Derrell Stokes. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(ca)
May 26, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Gerald Derrell Stokes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stokes v. State of Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Attorney General State of Georgia (Notice Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gerald Derrell Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?