Boyd v. The Thomson Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Roy J. Boyd, Jr.
Defendant: West Publishing Corporation doing business as FindLaw, Super Lawyers, and LawInfo and The Thomson Corporation
Case Number: 2:2021cv00052
Filed: May 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael Etmund. Jonathan Aust has entered an appearance in this case and vouches he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as this Court's Local Rule 83.4 requires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on July 16, 2021. (edd)
July 15, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing by The Thomson Corporation, West Publishing Corporation re #9 Notice of Filing, #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael T. Etmund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Aust, Jonathan) Modified on 7/15/2021 (slt).
July 15, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael T. Etmund. (slt)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 8/9/2021, Discovery due by 9/15/2021, Motions due by 2/18/2022, Pretrial Order due by 3/18/2022, Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 11/15/2021, Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 12/15/2021, Status Report due by 1/17/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 7/13/2021. (pts)
July 13, 2021 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 1/19/2022 04:00 PM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. Dial-in instructions will be provided by Courtroom Deputy Clerk prior to scheduled call. (KM)
July 8, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael T. Etmund. After 14 days a notice of noncompliance will be submitted to a judicial officer for possible sanctions, to include dismissal. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 7/22/2021. (thb)
July 8, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael T. Etmund Receipt Number AGASDC-3141379, Fee Amount $200, by The Thomson Corporation, West Publishing Corporation. Responses due by 7/22/2021. (Aust, Jonathan) Certificate of Good Standing and Statement re: Previous Appearance in SDGA are attached to Notice #12 . Modified on 7/15/2021 (slt).
July 7, 2021 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro: Telephonic Status Conference held on 7/7/2021. (Tape #FTR-BWC-CHAMBERS.) (KM)
July 6, 2021 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 7/7/2021 04:00 PM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. Dial-in instructions will be provided by Courtroom Deputy Clerk prior to scheduled call. (KM)
June 30, 2021 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Savage, Brent)
June 30, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (JH)
June 4, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Brent Savage on behalf of Roy J. Boyd, Jr (Savage, Brent)
June 2, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by The Thomson Corporation, West Publishing Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Aust, Jonathan)
May 26, 2021 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by The Thomson Corporation, West Publishing Corporation. (Aust, Jonathan)
May 26, 2021 Filing 3 REMOVAL NOTICE to all Counsel of Record. Set/Reset Deadlines: The Thomson Corporation answer due 6/2/2021; West Publishing Corporation answer due 6/2/2021. Compliance due by 6/5/2021. Pending Motions due by 6/9/2021. (ca)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 5/26/2021. (ca)
May 26, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of Glynn County, State of Georgia, case number CE21-00448. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGASDC-3113828), filed by West Publishing Corporation, The Thomson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1 - Service with return receipt, #3 Exhibit 2 - LawInto, #4 Exhibit 3 - Email Correspondences, Summons, Case Filing Information, Certificate under Rule 3.2, Plaintiff's Interrogatories, Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyd v. The Thomson Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy J. Boyd, Jr.
Represented By: Brent Savage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Publishing Corporation doing business as FindLaw, Super Lawyers, and LawInfo
Represented By: Jonathan K. Aust
Represented By: Michael T. Etmund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Thomson Corporation
Represented By: Jonathan K. Aust
Represented By: Michael T. Etmund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?