Auto-Owners Insurance Company v. Nguyen et al
Plaintiff: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Defendant: Hung Van Nguyen Individually and doing business as "Lisa Nails" or "Lisa Nails Salon" (A proprietorship), Quyen Vinh Nguy Individually and doing business as "Lisa Nails" or "Lisa Nails Salon" (A proprietorship) and Martha Miles
Case Number: 2:2021cv00078
Filed: August 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2021 Filing 10 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Martha Miles, Quyen Vinh Nguy, Hung Van Nguyen. (JH)
October 25, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Entry of Default Plaintiff's Request for Entry of Default as to Quyen Vinh Nguy, Martha Miles, and Hung Van Nguyen by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. Responses due by 11/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Request for Entry of Default as to Martha Miles, #2 Plaintiff's Request for Entry of Default as to Hung Van Nguyen dba Lisa Nails)(Strickland, Rebecca) Modified on 10/25/2021 (JH).
September 14, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and Summons served on Queyen Vinh Nguy, Registered Agent on September 11, 2021, filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Strickland, Rebecca)
September 14, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and Summons served on Queyen Vinh Nguy, Individually on September 11, 2021, filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Strickland, Rebecca)
September 14, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Quyen Vinh Nguy answer due 10/2/2021. (slt)
September 10, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and Summons served on Hung Van Nguyen, Individually on September 9, 2021, filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Strickland, Rebecca)
September 10, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and Summons served on Martha Miles on September 9, 2021, filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Strickland, Rebecca)
September 10, 2021 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and Summons served on Registered Agent, Hung Van Nguyen on September 9, 2021, filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Strickland, Rebecca)
September 10, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Martha Miles answer due 9/30/2021; Quyen Vinh Nguy answer due 9/30/2021; Hung Van Nguyen answer due 9/30/2021. (slt)
August 27, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (csr)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 8/27/2021. (csr)
August 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet). (csr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/30/2021: #4 Flattened Civil Cover Sheet) (JH).
August 27, 2021 Filing fee: $402.00, receipt number AGASDC-3174566. (csr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Auto-Owners Insurance Company v. Nguyen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Rebecca E. Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hung Van Nguyen Individually and doing business as "Lisa Nails" or "Lisa Nails Salon" (A proprietorship)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quyen Vinh Nguy Individually and doing business as "Lisa Nails" or "Lisa Nails Salon" (A proprietorship)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?