J.H. Parker Co., Inc. et al v. United States et al
Plaintiff: J.H. Parker Co., Inc., Parker's Surrency #208, Parker's Sterling, Parker's Perry Lane, Parker's Park Place, Parker's Hinesville Express, Parker's Crispen, Parker's Causeway #212, Parker's Cate and Parker's Altama #202
Defendant: United States and United States Department of Agriculture
Case Number: 2:2021cv00082
Filed: September 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Stipulation and Order of settlement dismissing case with prejudice and without costs, expenses, or attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 10/27/21. (wwp)
October 26, 2021 Filing 14 STIPULATION of Dismissal and Order of Settlement by United States, United States Department of Agriculture. (Leithart, Otto)
September 10, 2021 September 13, 2021 MOTION hearing is TERMINATED. (WS)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting re #3 Motion to Stay. It is hereby ordered that the suspension of Plaintiff's SNAP program participation be stayed until such time as this civil action is concluded. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 9/9/21. (loh)
September 9, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION to Stay filed by United States, United States Department of Agriculture. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Leithart, Otto)
September 8, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #9 Affidavit of Service, #8 Affidavit of Service, #10 Affidavit of Service. (thb)
September 8, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint and pleadings by Certified Mail to USDA (see also Doc 9) served on Willie Taylor, USDA-FNS Regional Administrator on 9-8-2021, filed by J.H. Parker Co., Inc., Parker's Altama #202, Parker's Cate, Parker's Causeway #212, Parker's Crispen, Parker's Hinesville Express, Parker's Park Place, Parker's Perry Lane, Parker's Sterling, Parker's Surrency #208. (Kachmar, Shawn)
September 8, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint and pleadings on U.S. Department of Agriculture served on Patrick Schwendler Asst U.S. Attorney on 9-8-2021, filed by J.H. Parker Co., Inc., Parker's Altama #202, Parker's Cate, Parker's Causeway #212, Parker's Crispen, Parker's Hinesville Express, Parker's Park Place, Parker's Perry Lane, Parker's Sterling, Parker's Surrency #208. (Kachmar, Shawn)
September 8, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint and pleadings on United States served on Patrick Schwendler Asst US Attorney on 9-8-2021, filed by J.H. Parker Co., Inc., Parker's Altama #202, Parker's Cate, Parker's Causeway #212, Parker's Crispen, Parker's Hinesville Express, Parker's Park Place, Parker's Perry Lane, Parker's Sterling, Parker's Surrency #208. (Kachmar, Shawn)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re: Notice of Hearing on #3 Motion to Stay. The parties are permitted but not required to file briefs by 5:00 pm, Friday, September 10, 2021. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 9/8/2021. (csr)
September 8, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Briefs due by 9/10/2021 re: #7 Order. (csr)
September 8, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: United States answer due 11/7/2021; United States Department of Agriculture answer due 11/7/2021. (thb)
September 7, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Otto Woelke Leithart on behalf of United States, United States Department of Agriculture (Leithart, Otto)
September 7, 2021 Motions No Longer Referred: #3 MOTION to Stay. (thb)
September 7, 2021 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #3 MOTION to Stay : Motion Hearing set for 9/13/2021 02:00 PM in Brunswick - Courtroom No. 1 - before Judge Lisa G. Wood. (WS)
September 3, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing by J.H. Parker Co., Inc., Parker's Altama #202, Parker's Cate, Parker's Causeway #212, Parker's Crispen, Parker's Hinesville Express, Parker's Park Place, Parker's Perry Lane, Parker's Sterling, Parker's Surrency #208 re #3 MOTION to Stay of Administrative Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Motion for Stay, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Exhibit 1 to Motion for Stay, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Exhibit 1 to Motion for Stay, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Exhibit 1 to Motion for Stay)(Kachmar, Shawn)
September 3, 2021 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by J.H. Parker Co., Inc., Parker's Surrency #208, Parkers Altama #202, Parkers Cate, Parkers Causeway #212, Parkers Crispen, Parkers Hinesville Express, Parkers Park Place, Parkers Perry Lane, Parkers Sterling. (ca)
September 3, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Stay by J.H. Parker Co., Inc., Parker's Surrency #208, Parkers Altama #202, Parkers Cate, Parkers Causeway #212, Parkers Crispen, Parkers Hinesville Express, Parkers Park Place, Parkers Perry Lane, Parkers Sterling. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit B. (Restricted due to incorrect attachment), #3 Exhibit C)(ca). Modified on 9/3/2021 (csr).
September 3, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to United States, United States Department of Agriculture. (ca)
September 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Judicial Review of Final Administrative Actions and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants, filed by Parkers Hinesville Express, Parker's Surrency #208, Parkers Perry Lane, Parkers Park Place, Parkers Cate, Parkers Causeway #212, J.H. Parker Co., Inc., Parkers Altama #202, Parkers Crispen, Parkers Sterling. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(ca)
September 3, 2021 Filing fee: $402, receipt number AGASDC-3179304. (ca)
September 3, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #3 MOTION to Stay. (thb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J.H. Parker Co., Inc. et al v. United States et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.H. Parker Co., Inc.
Represented By: Shawn A. Kachmar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parker's Surrency #208
Represented By: Shawn A. Kachmar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parker's Sterling
Represented By: Shawn A. Kachmar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parker's Perry Lane
Represented By: Shawn A. Kachmar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parker's Park Place
Represented By: Shawn A. Kachmar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parker's Hinesville Express
Represented By: Shawn A. Kachmar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parker's Crispen
Represented By: Shawn A. Kachmar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parker's Causeway #212
Represented By: Shawn A. Kachmar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parker's Cate
Represented By: Shawn A. Kachmar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parker's Altama #202
Represented By: Shawn A. Kachmar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Represented By: Otto Woelke Leithart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture
Represented By: Otto Woelke Leithart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?