Griffin v. Radius Global Solutions, LLC
Plaintiff: Robert. Griffin
Defendant: Radius Global Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00130
Filed: December 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting [8,10] Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kirsten Smith. Charles Dorminy has entered an appearance in this case and vouches he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as this Court's Local Rule 83.4 requires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on January 13, 2022. (edd)
January 12, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number AGASDC-3263386, Fee Amount $200, by Radius Global Solutions, LLC. Responses due by 1/26/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit List of All Case Counsel Appeared in the USDC SD GA)(Dorminy, Charles) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/12/2022: #3 Main Document (Correct PDF)) (thb).
January 12, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Receipt Number AGASDC-3263089, Fee Amount $200. (thb) Modified on 1/12/2022 (thb).
January 12, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number AGASDC-3263089, Fee Amount $200, by Radius Global Solutions, LLC. Responses due by 1/26/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit List of All Case Counsel Appeared in the USDC SD GA)(Dorminy, Charles) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/12/2022: #3 Main Document (Correct PDF)) (thb). (Attachment 3 replaced on 1/12/2022) (thb).
January 12, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED: #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Receipt Number AGASDC-3263089, Fee Amount $200. (thb)
January 12, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED: #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number AGASDC-3263386, Fee Amount $200. (thb)
January 5, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Douglas Adams on behalf of Robert. Griffin (Adams, W.)
December 29, 2021 Filing 6 DEFICIENCY NOTICE re: #5 Answer to Complaint. After 14 days a notice of noncompliance will be submitted to a judicial officer for possible sanctions, to include dismissal. (slt)
December 29, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance with deficiency notice due by 1/12/2022. (slt)
December 23, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Radius Global Solutions, LLC.(Dorminy, Charles)
December 17, 2021 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Radius Global Solutions, LLC. (Dorminy, Charles)
December 17, 2021 Filing 3 Removal NOTICE to all Counsel of Record re #1 Notice of Removal. Set Deadlines: Radius Global Solutions, LLC answer due 12/24/2021. Compliance due by 12/27/2021. Pending Motions due by 12/31/2021. (ca)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 12/17/2021. (ca)
December 16, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Magistrate Court of Glynn County, case number 2102838. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGASDC-3248817), filed by Radius Global Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Service of Process, Sheriff's Entry of Service, Summons, Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin v. Radius Global Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert. Griffin
Represented By: W. Douglas Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Radius Global Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Charles A. Dorminy
Represented By: Kirsten H. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?