The State of Georgia v. Georgia Department of Community Health et al
Plaintiff: The State of Georgia and Georgia Department of Community Health
Defendant: Chiquita Brooks-LaSure, Xavier Becerra, The United States Department of Health and Human Services, The United States of America and The Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services
Case Number: 2:2022cv00006
Filed: January 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED: #16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Response to Complaint. (thb)
March 21, 2022 Filing 17 *******Joint MOTION for a Briefing Schedule , Joint MOTION to Stay Case-Management Deadlines, Joint MOTION to Expedite by Xavier Becerra, Chiquita Brooks-LaSure, The Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, The United States Department of Health and Human Services, The United States of America. Responses due by 4/4/2022. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Andrapalliyal, Vinita)
March 21, 2022 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Response to Complaint by Xavier Becerra, Chiquita Brooks-LaSure, The Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, The United States Department of Health and Human Services, The United States of America. Responses due by 4/4/2022. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Andrapalliyal, Vinita)
March 21, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Vinita Andrapalliyal on behalf of All Defendants (Andrapalliyal, Vinita)
March 17, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE issued re: #13 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Georgia Department of Community Health, The State of Georgia. Responses due by 4/6/2022. (slt)
March 16, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Georgia Department of Community Health, The State of Georgia. Responses due by 4/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Stmt of Material Fact, #2 Affidavit Shapiro Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11)(Harris, Jeffrey). Added MOTION for Hearing on 3/17/2022 (slt).
February 2, 2022 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on David Estes, United States Attorney for the Southern District of Georgia on 1/24/22, filed by Georgia Department of Community Health, The State of Georgia. (Scott, Paul)
February 2, 2022 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on United States Department of Health and Human Services on 1/27/22, filed by Georgia Department of Community Health, The State of Georgia. (Scott, Paul)
February 2, 2022 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services on 1/27/22, filed by Georgia Department of Community Health, The State of Georgia. (Scott, Paul)
February 2, 2022 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Chiquita Brooks-LaSure, in her official capacity, as the Administrator of the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services on 1/27/22, filed by Georgia Department of Community Health, The State of Georgia. (Scott, Paul)
February 2, 2022 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Xavier Becerra, sued in his official capacity, is the Secretary of the Department of Health and Human Services. on 1/27/22, filed by Georgia Department of Community Health, The State of Georgia. (Scott, Paul)
February 2, 2022 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on United States of America on 1/27/22, filed by Georgia Department of Community Health, The State of Georgia. (Scott, Paul)
February 2, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Xavier Becerra answer due 3/28/2022; Chiquita Brooks-LaSure answer due 3/28/2022; The Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services answer due 3/28/2022; The United States Department of Health and Human Services answer due 3/28/2022; The United States of America answer due 3/28/2022. (slt)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel Shapiro. Paul Scott has entered an appearance in this case and vouches he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as this Court's Local Rule 83.4 requires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on February 1, 2022. (edd)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey Harris. Paul Scott has entered an appearance in this case and vouches he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as this Court's Local Rule 83.4 requires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on February 1, 2022. (edd)
January 31, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number AGASDC-3274936, Fee Amount $200, by Georgia Department of Community Health, The State of Georgia. Responses due by 2/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Scott, Paul)
January 31, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number AGASDC-3274923, Fee Amount $200, by Georgia Department of Community Health, The State of Georgia. Responses due by 2/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Scott, Paul)
January 31, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED: #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (slt)
January 21, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Xavier Becerra, Chiquita Brooks-LaSure, The Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, The United States Department of Health and Human Services, The United States of America. (ca)
January 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by The State of Georgia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ca)
January 21, 2022 Filing fee: $402, receipt number AGASDC-3268772. (ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The State of Georgia v. Georgia Department of Community Health et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of Georgia
Represented By: G. Todd Carter
Represented By: Paul Michael Scott
Represented By: Daniel Shapiro
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia Department of Community Health
Represented By: G. Todd Carter
Represented By: Paul Michael Scott
Represented By: Daniel Shapiro
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chiquita Brooks-LaSure
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?