Glynn County, Georgia v. GL NV24 Shipping Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Glynn County, Georgia
Defendant: GL NV24 Shipping Inc., Hyundai Glovis Co., G-Marine Service Co., Ltd, Norton Lilly International, Inc. and T&T Salvage LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv00028
Filed: March 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391 Venue Generally
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brandon Taylor. Bradley Watkins has entered an appearance in this case and vouches he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as this Courts Local Rule 83.4 requires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on May 4, 2022. (edd)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Louise Caro. Bradley Watkins has entered an appearance in this case and vouches he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as this Courts Local Rule 83.4 requires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on May 4, 2022. (edd)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Darren Sumich. Bradley Watkins has entered an appearance in this case and vouches he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as this Courts Local Rule 83.4 requires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on May 4, 2022. (edd)
April 28, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED: #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of DARREN SUMICH Receipt Number AGASDC-3336263, Fee Amount $200; #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of LOUISE CARO Receipt Number AGASDC-3336267, Fee Amount $200; #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of BRANDON TAYLOR Receipt Number AGASDC-3336278, Fee Amount $200. (JH)
April 27, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of BRANDON TAYLOR Receipt Number AGASDC-3336278, Fee Amount $200, by Glynn County, Georgia. Responses due by 5/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING, #2 Exhibit ADMISSION DISCLOSURE, #3 Exhibit PROPOSED ORDER)(Watkins, Bradley)
April 27, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of LOUISE CARO Receipt Number AGASDC-3336267, Fee Amount $200, by Glynn County, Georgia. Responses due by 5/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING, #2 Exhibit ADMISSION DISCLOSURE, #3 Exhibit PROPOSED ORDER)(Watkins, Bradley)
April 27, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of DARREN SUMICH Receipt Number AGASDC-3336263, Fee Amount $200, by Glynn County, Georgia. Responses due by 5/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING, #2 Exhibit ADMISSION DISCLOSURE, #3 Exhibit PROPOSED ORDER)(Watkins, Bradley)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 3/25/2022. (ca)
March 25, 2022 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Glynn County, Georgia. (ca)
March 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Glynn County, Georgia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ca)
March 25, 2022 Filing fee: $402, receipt number AGASDC-3313744. (ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glynn County, Georgia v. GL NV24 Shipping Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glynn County, Georgia
Represented By: Bradley J. Watkins
Represented By: Brandon J. Taylor
Represented By: Darren Sumich
Represented By: Louise R. Caro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GL NV24 Shipping Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Glovis Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G-Marine Service Co., Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norton Lilly International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T&T Salvage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?