Boatwright et al v. Broce et al
Plaintiff: Brittney D. Boatwright and Patricia B. Swain
Defendant: Candice L. Broce, Lashawnda Askew, Jane/John Doe Number One, Brandy McCorkle, Jane/John Doe Number Two and Jane/John Doe Number Three
Case Number: 2:2022cv00038
Filed: April 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Civil Rights Violation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2022 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Lashawnda Askew, Candice L. Broce, Brandy McCorkle. (Knowles, Jason)
June 9, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Intent to File Reply re #18 MOTION to Dismiss, by Lashawnda Askew, Candice L. Broce, Brandy McCorkle. (Knowles, Jason) Link added. Modified on 6/9/2022 (thb).
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER granting #21 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Accept Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' Response filed at Document Number 19 is deemed timely filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on June 7, 2022. (edd)
June 1, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION Brittney D. Boatwright and Patricia B. Swains Unopposed Motion to Accept Their Response in Opposition and Brief in Support to Defendants Candice L. Broce, LaShawnda Askew, and Bandy McCorkles Motion to Dismiss re #19 Response in Opposition to Motion by Brittney D. Boatwright, Patricia B. Swain. Responses due by 6/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Yancey, James)
June 1, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #19 Response in Opposition to Motion. (thb)
May 31, 2022 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Patricia B. Swain and Brittney D. Boatwright. (Attachments: #1 Briefs)(Yancey, James) Modified on 6/1/2022 (thb).
May 16, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss by Lashawnda Askew, Candice L. Broce, Brandy McCorkle. Responses due by 5/30/2022. (Attachments: #1 Briefs in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Knowles, Jason)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying Plaintiffs' #15 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 5/10/2022. (csr)
May 6, 2022 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patricia B. Swain, Brittney D. Boatwright. Candice L. Broce served on 4/26/2022, answer due 5/17/2022. (Yancey, James)
May 6, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Brittney D. Boatwright, Patricia B. Swain. Responses due by 5/20/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Verifications, #2 Briefs Brief for Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Yancey, James)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #4 MOTION for Hearing filed by Brittney D. Boatwright, Patricia B. Swain. Having read and considered the responses, Plaintiffs' motion for a temporary restraining order is DENIED, and the hearing currently set for April 26, 2022 is CANCELLED. Any potential hearings on further requests for injunctive relief will be scheduled at a later date. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 04/25/2022. (WS)
April 25, 2022 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION for Hearing to Defendants Response in Opposition to Motion for Hearing filed by Brittney D. Boatwright, Patricia B. Swain. (Yancey, James)
April 25, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Steven Knowles on behalf of Lashawnda Askew, Candice L. Broce, Brandy McCorkle (Knowles, Jason)
April 25, 2022 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION for Hearing filed by Lashawnda Askew, Candice L. Broce, Brandy McCorkle. (Chalmers, Roger)
April 25, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Roger A. Chalmers on behalf of Lashawnda Askew, Candice L. Broce, Brandy McCorkle (Chalmers, Roger)
April 25, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patricia B. Swain, Brittney D. Boatwright. Brandy McCorkle served on 4/25/2022, answer due 5/16/2022. (Yancey, James)
April 25, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patricia B. Swain, Brittney D. Boatwright. Lashawnda Askew served on 4/25/2022, answer due 5/16/2022. (Yancey, James)
April 25, 2022 Filing 7 Amended Summons Issued as to Lashawnda Askew, Candice L. Broce. Summons issued as to Brandy McCorkle. (thb)
April 24, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Submitted (Yancey, James)
April 22, 2022 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion for Injunction set for 4/26/2022 10:00 AM in Brunswick - Courtroom No. 1 - before Judge Lisa G. Wood. (WS)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 04/21/2022. (jlh)
April 21, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Hearing on Injunction for the Week of April 25 - 29, 2022, by Brittney D. Boatwright and Patricia B. Swain. (jlh)
April 21, 2022 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Brittney D. Boatwright and Patricia B. Swain. (jlh)
April 21, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Lashawnda Askew and Candice L. Broce. (jlh)
April 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Patricia B. Swain, Brittney D. Boatwright. (Fee paid: Receipt # AGASDC-3330995, $402.00.) (Attachments: #1 Verification - Boatwright, #2 Verification - Swain, and #3 Civil Cover Sheet.) (jlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boatwright et al v. Broce et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittney D. Boatwright
Represented By: James A Yancey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia B. Swain
Represented By: James A Yancey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Candice L. Broce
Represented By: Jason Steven Knowles
Represented By: Roger A. Chalmers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lashawnda Askew
Represented By: Jason Steven Knowles
Represented By: Roger A. Chalmers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane/John Doe Number One
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandy McCorkle
Represented By: Jason Steven Knowles
Represented By: Roger A. Chalmers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane/John Doe Number Two
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane/John Doe Number Three
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?