Greene v. Corbett et al
Plaintiff: Annette Greene
Defendant: Ron Corbett, Stephanie Britt, Willie Pinkney and Steven McNeil
Case Number: 2:2022cv00126
Filed: November 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Accordingly, all claims asserted in this case action are DISMISSED without prejudice. Each party shall bear its own fees and costs. Defendants' re #11 MOTION to Dismiss and re #12 MOTION to Stay are DENIED as moot. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close this case. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 1/11/23. (loh)
January 9, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Annette Greene (Thomas, Morrison)
December 28, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED: #12 MOTION to Stay re #11 MOTION to Dismiss. (thb)
December 27, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay re #11 MOTION to Dismiss by Stephanie Britt, Ron Corbett, Steven McNeil, Willie Pinkney. Responses due by 1/10/2023. (Hancock, Emily)
December 27, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Stephanie Britt, Ron Corbett, Steven McNeil, Willie Pinkney. Responses due by 1/10/2023. (Hancock, Emily)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Clerk's Extension of Time (LR 6.1). Defendants' answer or responsive pleading is due on or before 12/26/22. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 12/12/22. (slt)
December 12, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Stephanie Britt, Ron Corbett, Steven McNeil, and Willie Pinkney answers due 12/26/2022. (slt)
December 9, 2022 Filing 9 Consent Motion for Clerks Extension of Time (LR 6.1) to 12/26/2022 by Stephanie Britt, Ron Corbett, Steven McNeil, Willie Pinkney. Responses due by 12/23/2022. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Strickland, Richard)
December 1, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Annette Greene. Willie Pinkney served on 11/29/2022, answer due 12/20/2022. (Thomas, Morrison)
November 29, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Annette Greene. Steven McNeil served on 11/22/2022, answer due 12/13/2022. (Thomas, Morrison)
November 29, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Annette Greene. Stephanie Britt served on 11/21/2022, answer due 12/12/2022. (Thomas, Morrison)
November 29, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Annette Greene. Ron Corbett served on 11/21/2022, answer due 12/12/2022. (Thomas, Morrison)
November 16, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Ron Corbett. (thb)
November 15, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Stephanie Britt, Steven McNeil, Willie Pinkney. (ca)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 11/15/2022. (ca)
November 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Annette Greene. (Fee paid: Receipt # AGASDC-3466778, $402) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greene v. Corbett et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Greene
Represented By: Morrison Waite Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Corbett
Represented By: Richard K. Strickland
Represented By: Emily Rose Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Britt
Represented By: Emily Rose Hancock
Represented By: Richard K. Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willie Pinkney
Represented By: Richard K. Strickland
Represented By: Emily Rose Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven McNeil
Represented By: Richard K. Strickland
Represented By: Emily Rose Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?