Clay v. Jump et al
Plaintiff: Byron Donnelle Clay
Defendant: Sheriff Neal Jump, Glynn County Detention Center and M. Morales
Case Number: 2:2023cv00110
Filed: September 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Byron Donnelle Clay. The Court has assessed an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $26.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 10/16/2023. (jlh)
October 13, 2023 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. Judge Lisa G. Wood no longer assigned to the case. (ca)
October 11, 2023 Filing 8 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Byron Donnelle Clay. (ca)
October 11, 2023 Filing 7 CONSENT by Prisoner Byron Donnelle Clay to collection of fees. (ca)
October 5, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re 5 Statement Regarding Assignment of Case to United States Magistrate Judge. No selection made. After 14 days of noncompliance, a notice will be submitted to a judicial officer for possible sanctions, to include dismissal. (Attachments: #1 Party's Statement Regarding Assignment of Case to a U.S. Magistrate Judge) (gmh)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff must return the PLRA forms to the Clerk on or before November 1, 2023. PLRA due by 11/1/2023.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 10/2/23. (wwp)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re Magistrate Assignment as to Neal Jump, Glynn County Detention Center, M. Morales. Plaintiff Statement Re Assignment Due on 10/13/2023. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 9/29/2023. (Attachments: #1 Party's Statement Regarding Assignment of Case to a U.S. Magistrate Judge) (gmh)
September 29, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Byron Donnelle Clay. Responses due by 10/13/2023. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. (gmh)
September 29, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Byron Donnelle Clay. (gmh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clay v. Jump et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Byron Donnelle Clay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Neal Jump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glynn County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?