Pinder et al v. Nautilus Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Lucy Pinder, Denise Milani and Carmen Electra
Defendant: Nautilus Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2024cv00033
Filed: March 1, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391 Venue Generally
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Golaszewski. Joshua Schiffer has entered an appearance in this case and vouches he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel. Local R. 83.4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on March 20, 2024. (edd)
March 18, 2024 MOTIONS REFERRED: #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Receipt Number AGASDC-3787658, Fee Amount $200. (csr)
March 15, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number AGASDC-3787658, Fee Amount $200, by Carmen Electra, Denise Milani, Lucy Pinder. Responses due by 3/29/2024. (Schiffer, Joshua)
March 1, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint. If action is required, after 14 days of noncompliance a notice will be submitted to a judicial officer for possible sanctions, to include dismissal. (Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 3/15/2024.) (jlh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/1/2024: #1 Corrected Main Document) (jlh).
March 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 03/01/2024. (jlh)
March 1, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Nautilus Insurance Company. (jlh)
March 1, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nautilus Insurance Company, filed by Lucy Pinder, Denise Milani, and Carmen Electra. (Fee paid: Receipt # AGASDC-3777343, $405.00.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 - Final Consent Judgment, #3 Exhibit 3 - Letter, and #4 Civil Cover Sheet.) (jlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pinder et al v. Nautilus Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucy Pinder
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Represented By: Joshua Gordon Schiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Milani
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Represented By: Joshua Gordon Schiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Electra
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Represented By: Joshua Gordon Schiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nautilus Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?