Jacobs v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Plaintiff: Joseph Jacobs
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Case Number: 2:2024cv00082
Filed: June 28, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by William Jarrell Degenhart on behalf of Joseph Jacobs (Degenhart, William)
July 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 8/28/2024. Discovery due by 9/12/2024. Motions due by 2/11/2025. Pretrial Order due by 4/11/2025. Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 11/1/2024. Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 12/2/2024. Status Report due by 1/7/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 7/26/24. (wwp)
July 26, 2024 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 1/9/2025 03:00 PM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. Dial-in instructions will be provided by Courtroom Deputy prior to scheduled call. (KM)
July 24, 2024 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Searcy, Ann)
July 24, 2024 MOTIONS REFERRED: #8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (thb)
July 5, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Ann H. Searcy on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Searcy, Ann)
June 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 06/28/2024. (jlh)
June 28, 2024 Filing 5 Removal NOTICE to All Counsel of Record. (Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 7/8/2024.) (jlh)
June 28, 2024 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP identifying Walmart Inc. as Corporate Parent. (jlh)
June 28, 2024 Filing 3 Litigants' Bill of Rights, by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (jlh)
June 28, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE re Statement Enumerating All Motions Pending, by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (jlh)
June 28, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of Glynn County, Georgia, case number CE24-00031, filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Filing fee $ 405.00, receipt number AGASDC-3852273.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Answer, Complaint, Defendant's 5.2 Certificate of Discovery, Defendant's 5.2 Certificate of Discovery, and Case Filing Information Form, #2 Exhibit B - Email re Discovery, and #3 Civil Cover Sheet.) (jlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacobs v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Jacobs
Represented By: William Jarrell Degenhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Ann H. Searcy
Represented By: Garret W. Meader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?