v. Brunswick Division
Defendant: Brunswick Division
Case Number: 2:2025tc05000
Filed: December 30, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2025 Filing 8 Complaint - Guoquan Mei v. Pam Bondi, et al. . Fee paid: Receipt # AGASDC-4009210, $405(Evans, Stacey)
February 20, 2025 Filing 7 CV225-028 Wood/Cheesbro assigned and uploaded to the pleadings queue - Complaint - Removal Sandra Simon v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP Notice of Removal from Superior Court Camden County Case# SUCV2024001125. Fee paid: Receipt # AGASDC-4005312, $405(Meader, Garret) Modified on 2/21/2025 (cmr).
February 19, 2025 Filing 6 CV225-027 Wood/Cheesbro assigned and uploaded to the pleadings queue - Complaint - JULIUS MONTGOMERY v. LVNV FUNDING, LLC et al . Fee paid: Receipt # AGASDC-4004370, $405(Berry, Matthew) Modified on 2/20/2025 (cmr).
February 19, 2025 Filing 5 CV225-026 Wood/Cheesbro assigned and uploaded to the pleadings queue - Complaint - Riteshkumar Ramanbhai Patel v. Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services . Fee paid: Receipt # AGASDC-4004267, $405(Lefkoff, Steven) Modified on 2/19/2025 (cmr).
January 15, 2025 Filing 4 CV225-015 Wood/Cheesbro assigned and uploaded to the pleadings queue - Complaint - Thomas Parker v. Fultz Services, LLC . Fee paid: Receipt # AGASDC-3977094, $405(Corry, Brian) Modified on 1/15/2025 (cmr).
January 14, 2025 Filing 3 CV225-014 Wood/Cheesbro assigned and uploaded to the pleadings queue - Complaint - Monica Oliver v. Five Rivers Hospitality, LLC et al. . Fee paid: Receipt # AGASDC-3976681, $405(Kecskes, Ian) Modified on 1/15/2025 (cmr).
January 8, 2025 Filing 2 CV225-007 Wood/Cheesbro assigned and uploaded to the pleadings queue - Complaint - Removal Samuel Buckner, Jr. and Cashunda Buckner v. Travelers Personal Insurance Company . Fee paid: Receipt # AGASDC-3970365, $405(Karabinos, Karen) Modified on 1/10/2025 (cmr).
January 2, 2025 Filing 1 CV225-001 Wood/Cheesbro assigned and uploaded to the pleadings queue - Complaint (IFP) - David Smiley v. Glynn County, Georgia et al. (Mumford, Roland) Modified on 1/3/2025 (cmr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: v. Brunswick Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brunswick Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?