Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation v. Graham
Plaintiff: Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation
Defendant: Joshua Kight and Claude Graham
Case Number: 3:2014cv00023
Filed: March 6, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Dublin Office
County: Laurens
Presiding Judge: Dudley H Bowen
Referring Judge: Brian K Epps
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs, except as otherwise provided by the parties' settlement agreement. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 1/11/16. (cmr)
January 8, 2016 Filing 41 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. (Bingham, Ron)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER directing the parties to file a stipulation of dismissal or a revised joint status report no later than January 8, 2016. (Status Report due by 1/8/2016). Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 12/4/15. (cmr)
September 30, 2015 Filing 39 STATUS REPORT by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. (Bingham, Ron)
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #37 Motion to Withdraw; and terminating #35 Motion to Withdraw. Ronald J. Stay is terminated as counsel of record for Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 8/17/15. (cmr)
August 14, 2015 Filing 37 Supplemental MOTION to Withdraw #35 MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. Responses due by 8/31/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stay, Ronald)
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER continuing the stay in this case and setting a status report deadline, (status Report due by 9/30/2015). Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 7/31/15. (cmr)
July 31, 2015 Filing 35 MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. Responses due by 8/17/2015. (Stay, Ronald)
July 31, 2015 Filing 34 STATUS REPORT by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. (Bingham, Ron)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #32 Motion to Stay. This case is stayed until 7/31/15 and on or before that date, the parties are to submit a status report. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 5/4/15. (cmr)
May 4, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines: Case is stayed until this date and a Status Report due by 7/31/2015. (cmr)
April 30, 2015 Filing 32 MOTION to Stay Case by Joshua Kight. Responses due by 5/18/2015. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Boudreaux, Todd)
April 3, 2015 Filing 31 NOTICE by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation of Intent to Advance Motion for Summary Judgment (Bingham, Ron)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDERED that, on or before April 30, 2015, Plaintiff shall inform the Court whether it intends to withdraw or advance its motion for summary judgment. Further ordered that, on or before April 30, 2015, Defendant Kight shall file a response to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment or an otherwise responsive pleading. (Compliance due by 4/30/2015). Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 4/2/15. (cmr)
March 9, 2015 Filing 29 NOTICE of Change of Address by Ron C. Bingham. (Bingham, Ron)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Leave of Absence. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 2/12/15. (cmr)
February 11, 2015 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation for dates of : April 6, 2015 through and including April 10, 2015, April 13, 2015 through and including April 15, 2015, July 6, 2015 through and including July 10, 2015, and July 13, 2015 through and including July 15, 2015 by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. Responses due by 3/2/2015. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stay, Ronald)
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Substitute Party. Joshua Kight, in his official capacity as conservator for Claude Graham, is hereby substituted for Claude Graham as Defendant in this case. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 1/9/15. (cmr)
December 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time Responses due by 3/23/2015. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 12/29/14. (cmr)
December 29, 2014 Reset Deadlines as to #17 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Responses due by 3/23/2015. (cmr)
December 22, 2014 Filing 24 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to March 23, 2015 . by Claude Graham. Responses due by 1/8/2015. (Boudreaux, Todd)
December 18, 2014 Filing 23 MOTION to Substitute Party by Claude Graham. Responses due by 1/4/2015. (Boudreaux, Todd)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time. Responses due by 12/20/2014. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 10/17/14. (cmr)
October 16, 2014 Filing 21 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to December 22, 2014 . by Claude Graham. Responses due by 11/3/2014. (Boudreaux, Todd)
September 24, 2014 Filing 20 NOTICE issued re: #17 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. Responses due by 10/20/2014. (cmr)
September 24, 2014 Filing 19 NOTICE of Filing by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation re #17 MOTION for Summary Judgment REQUEST FOR FILING DISCOVERY (Stay, Ronald)
September 24, 2014 Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation re #17 MOTION for Summary Judgment NOTICE OF FILING DISCOVERY (Stay, Ronald)
September 24, 2014 Filing 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. Responses due by 10/20/2014. (Attachments: #1 Stmt of Material Fact, #2 Briefs, #3 Exhibit 1-Affidavit in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Exhibit 1 to Affidavit, #5 Exhibit 2 to Affidavit, #6 Exhibit 3 to Affidavit, #7 Exhibit 4 to Affidavit, #8 Exhibit 5 to Affidavit, #9 Exhibit 6 to Affidavit, #10 Exhibit 7 to Affidavit, #11 Exhibit 8 to Affidavit, #12 Exhibit 9 to Affidavit, #13 Exhibit 10 to Affidavit, #14 Exhibit 11 to Affidavit, #15 Exhibit 12 to Affidavit, #16 Exhibit 13 to Affidavit, #17 Exhibit 14 to Affidavit, #18 Exhibit 15 to Affidavit, #19 Exhibit 16 to Affidavit, #20 Exhibit 17 to Affidavit, #21 Exhibit 18 to Affidavit, #22 Exhibit 19 to Affidavit, #23 Exhibit 20 to Affidavit, #24 Exhibit 21 to Affidavit, #25 Exhibit 22 to Affidavit, #26 Exhibit 23 to Affidavit, #27 Exhibit 24 to Affidavit, #28 Exhibit 25 to Affidavit, #29 Exhibit 26 to Affidavit, #30 Exhibit 27 to Affidavit, #31 Exhibit 28 to Affidavit, #32 Exhibit 2 to Brief, #33 Exhibit 3 to Brief)(Stay, Ronald)
May 14, 2014 Filing 16 NOTICE of Restriction/Return of Discovery Related Material - re 15 Certificate of Service. (cmr)
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting for Todd Boudreaux #13 Motion for Leave of Absence. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 5/14/14. (cmr)
May 13, 2014 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Claude Graham for dates of : July 3-9, 2014, Aug 11-26, 2014 by Claude Graham. Responses due by 5/30/2014. (Boudreaux, Todd)
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 6/6/2014. Discovery due by 8/25/2014. Motions due by 9/24/2014. Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 6/28/2014. Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 7/28/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 5/9/14. (cmr)
May 8, 2014 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Stay, Ronald)
April 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting for Ronald J. Stay the #9 Motion for Leave of Absence. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 4/28/14. (cmr)
April 28, 2014 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation for dates of : July 7, 2014 through and including July 11, 2014, July 14, 2014 through and including July 15, 2014, September 15, 2014 through and including September 19, 2014, December 24, 2014, December 29, 2014 through and including December 30, 2014, January 2, 2015, January 5, 2015 through and including January 6, 2015 by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. Responses due by 5/15/2014. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order)(Stay, Ronald)
April 22, 2014 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald J. Stay on behalf of Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation (Stay, Ronald)
April 7, 2014 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Claude Graham. (Boudreaux, Todd)
April 7, 2014 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #1 Complaint filed by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation filed by Claude Graham. (Boudreaux, Todd)
March 19, 2014 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. Claude Graham served on 3/16/2014, answer due 4/7/2014. (Stay, Ronald)
March 6, 2014 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. (Bingham, Ron)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 3/6/14. (Attachments: #1 blank new case forms) (cmr)
March 6, 2014 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Claude Graham. (cmr)
March 6, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Claude Graham, filed by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. Filing fee Paid $400.(cmr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation v. Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Kight
Represented By: Todd Boudreaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claude Graham
Represented By: Todd Boudreaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation
Represented By: Ron C. Bingham, II
Represented By: Ronald J. Stay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?