Henry et al v. Community of Hope Center, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Willie Mack Henry, Brian Powell, Shaun Powell, Melvin Thomas, Ebb O'Neal, Jr., Author Lee Havard, Charline Wright and Carolyn Horne
Defendant: Community of Hope Center, Inc. and Johnny Vaughn
Case Number: 3:2014cv00118
Filed: October 21, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Dublin Office
County: Laurens
Presiding Judge: Dudley H. Bowen
Presiding Judge: Brian K. Epps
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting 86 Motion for Attorney Fees. The Clerk is directed to Enter Judgment against Defendant Johnny Vaughn awarding Plaintiffs $54,738.75 in attorney's fees. The Clerk is further directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 01/04/2018. (thb)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Directing Clerk to enter judgment against Johnny Vaughn and in favor of Plaintiffs Willie Mack Henry, Brian Powell, Shaun Powell, Meldon Thomas, Ebb O'Neal, Charline Wright, and Caroline Horne. The Clerk is further directed to enter judgment in favor of Johnny Vaughn and against Plaintiff Author Lee Havard. Plaintiff's motion for attorney's fees and costs due by 12/18/2017. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 12/4/2017. (pts)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 73 Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the Building for the Trial of this Matter. Each attorney may bring either one lap top or one tablet computer for reference during trial. Cell phones are not permitted in the courtroom. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 11/27/2017. (pts) Modified on 11/27/2017 (thb).
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER GIVING NOTICE of Pretrial Conference. Pretrial Conference set for 8/29/2017 11:00 AM in Dublin - at the J. Roy Rowland Federal Courthouse, before Judge Dudley H. Bowen. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 07/05/2017. (pts)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to enter enter judgment against Community of Hope Center, Inc. d/b/a Walter Wesley Joyner Academy and in favor of Plaintiff Carolyn Home in the amount of $870.40. The Clerk shall send a service copy of this Order to the following address: Community of Hope Center, Inc. c/o Mr. Johnny Vaughn at Post Office Box 1072, Dublin, Georgia 31040. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 03/23/2017. (thb)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER directing the Clerk to enter a judgment against Community of Hope Center, Inc. d/b/a Walter Wesley Joyner Academy and in favor of Plaintiff Willie Mack Henry in the amount of $42,792.00; in favor of Plaintiff Brian Powell in the amount of $24,615.00; in favor of Plaintiff Shaun Powell in the amount of $1,523.00; in favor of Plaintiff Melvin Thomas in the amount of $34,123.20; in favor of Plaintiff Ebb O'Neal, Jr. in the amount of $18,000.00; in favor of Plaint iff Author Lee Havard in the amount of $10,309.20; and in favor of Plaintiff Charline Wright in the amount of $54,118.40. Plaintiffs are directed to file their motion for attorney's fees and costs within 21 days hereof. This case is pl aced back on the active docket of the Court. Plaintiffs shall notify the Court with respect to their intention in prosecuting the claim of Plaintiff Carolyn Horne as well as their collective claims against Defendant Johnny Vaughn with in 14 days hereof. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 03/01/2017. (maa)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER directing the clerk to STRIKE 6 Answer from the record and enter default against it. Plaintiffs are DIRECTED to move for default judgment against Defendant Community of Hope Center, Inc. within 30 days of the Clerk's Entry of Default. ( Compliance due by 1/26/2017.) Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 12/27/2016. (maa)
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER directing service of this Order and 36 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, Order on Motion to Stay. ORDER that Defendant Community of Hope Center, Inc. enter a notice of appearance in this case within 14 days or show cause, in writing, why the court should not strike its answer and enter default against it. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 11/9/2016. (maa)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting 35 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Charles E. Cox, Jr. and C. Brian Jarrard terminated; granting 35 Motion to Stay. Community Hope Center, Inc. has 60 days for new counsel to file a notice of appearance. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 9/6/16. (cmr)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 33 Motion to Stay; terminating 32 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 5/23/16. (cmr)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting 30 Motion to Stay. This case is stayed for 60 days so that the parties have an opportunity to engage in settlement discussions. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 3/15/16. (cmr)
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 28 Motion to Stay the pretrial order deadline. The new pretrial order deadline is 3/14/16. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 1/27/16. (cmr)
January 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER AND NOTICE OF PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGS, (Pretrial Order due by 2/5/2016). Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 1/6/16. (cmr)
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting for Danielle Bess Obiorah 20 Motion for Leave to Appear. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 8/19/15. (cmr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henry et al v. Community of Hope Center, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Mack Henry
Represented By: Teri D. Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Powell
Represented By: Teri D. Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaun Powell
Represented By: Teri D. Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Thomas
Represented By: Teri D. Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ebb O'Neal, Jr.
Represented By: Teri D. Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Author Lee Havard
Represented By: Teri D. Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charline Wright
Represented By: Teri D. Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Horne
Represented By: Teri D. Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community of Hope Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?