Inman v. Zanders et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth L. Inman
Defendant: Sam Zanders, Tina Sanders, Department of Corrections and Homer Bryson
Case Number: 3:2015cv00095
Filed: November 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Dublin Office
County: Dodge
Presiding Judge: Dudley H. Bowen
Presiding Judge: Brian K. Epps
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in accordance with the Order of this Court entered on 3/6/17. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 3/6/17. (cmr)
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER ADOPTING 18 Report and Recommendations, DENYING AS MOOT 13 Motion for Screening, and DISMISSING Plaintiff's legal mail, access to the courts, and retaliatory transfer claims against Defendants Zanders and Sanders, and all claims against Defendants Homer Bryson and Department of Corrections. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 11/28/2016. (maa)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER instructing the plaintiff on responding to 20 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Sam Zanders, Tina Sanders. Plaintiff shall have until December 15, 2016 to respond. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/21/16. (cmr)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER directing Defendants Zanders and Sanders to file a response to Plaintiff's complaint and any outstanding motions by 11/18/16. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/28/2016. (maa)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing the plaintiff to explain within 14 days the reason for delay in service of process. (Compliance due by 4/29/2016). Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 4/15/16. (cmr)
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER providing instructions to the pro-se plaintiff regarding service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/24/15. (cmr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Inman v. Zanders et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth L. Inman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Zanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homer Bryson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?