Hooks et al v. Brewer et al
Plaintiff: Teresa Pope Hooks and Estate of David Hooks
Defendant: Christopher Brewer, Steve Vertin, William Harrell and Randall DeLoach
Case Number: 3:2016cv00023
Filed: April 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Dublin Office
County: Laurens
Presiding Judge: Dudley H. Bowen
Presiding Judge: Brian K. Epps
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER making the 152 USCA Mandate the judgment of this Court. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of Defendants Harrell and Vertin. The Clerk is further directed to terminate Teresa Pope Hicks, Individually, as a party to this case. Plaintiff's claims as administratrix of David Hooks' estate against Defendant Brewer shall proceed to trial in due course. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 10/21/2020. (pts)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER granting 133 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 2/20/2018. (pts)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting 61 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' claims against Randall Deloach are dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall bear their own costs. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 02/02/2017. (thb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hooks et al v. Brewer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Pope Hooks
Represented By: Mitchell M. Shook
Represented By: George Brian Spears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of David Hooks
Represented By: Mitchell M. Shook
Represented By: George Brian Spears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Brewer
Represented By: Timothy J. Buckley, III
Represented By: Kelly L. Christopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Vertin
Represented By: Timothy J. Buckley, III
Represented By: Kelly L. Christopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Harrell
Represented By: Timothy J. Buckley, III
Represented By: Kelly L. Christopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall DeLoach
Represented By: Timothy J. Buckley, III
Represented By: Kelly L. Christopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?