Givens v. Colvin
Plaintiff: Milton Givens
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 3:2016cv00036
Filed: May 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Dublin Office
County: Dodge
Presiding Judge: Dudley H. Bowen
Presiding Judge: Brian K. Epps
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 17 Motion for Attorney Fees; and granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court awards attorney's fees in the amount of $2,872.24 and costs in the amount of $419.40. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 7/17/17. (cmr)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in accordance with the Order of this Court entered on 5/18/17. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 5/18/17. (cmr)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER setting brief deadlines, (Plaintiff's Brief due by 11/5/2016). Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/6/16. (cmr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Givens v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milton Givens
Represented By: Edward B. Claxton, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Represented By: Shannon Heath Statkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?