Wilson v. Danforth et al

Plaintiff: Ricky Lewis Wilson
Defendant: William Danforth, Terence Kilpatrick, Fred Gammage, SGT Mixon, Robert Toole and Steve Upton
Case Number: 3:2016cv00040
Filed: June 6, 2016
Court: Georgia Southern District Court
Office: Dublin Office
County: Telfair
Presiding Judge: Dudley H. Bowen
Referring Judge: Brian K. Epps
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 22, 2018 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER overruling Defendants' objections and ADOPTING 89 Report and Recommendations. The Court grants in part and denies in part Defendants' 63 Motion to Dismiss filed by Fred Gammage, Phillip Hall, Terence Kilpatrick, William Danforth, Robert Toole and DISMISSES all claims for monetary relief against Defendants. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 1/22/2018. (pts)
October 11, 2017 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 70 Report and Recommendations. Plaintiff's 64 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 10/11/2017. (pts)
October 4, 2017 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 83 Motion for Subpoena. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/4/2017. (pts)
August 8, 2017 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 65 Motion to Stay. DISCOVERY is Stayed until the pending resolution of 63 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 08/08/2017. (pts)
May 30, 2017 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing 37 Motion and adopting 44 Report and Recommendations. Therefore, defendants Telfair County, Glen Johnson, Steve Upton, and Jacob Beasley are Dismissed from this case. Plaintiff's claims for monetary damages against all remaining defendants in their official capacities are also dismissed. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 5/30/17. (cmr)
November 2, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting the 16 Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation as the opinion of the Court; and denying Plaintiff's 11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 11/2/2016. (jah)
August 30, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing service of process to be effected upon the defendants by U.S. Marshal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 8/30/16. (cmr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Danforth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Lewis Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Danforth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terence Kilpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Gammage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SGT Mixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Upton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?