Sikes v. United States Department of the Navy

Plaintiff: Thomas W. Sikes
Defendant: United States Department of the Navy
Case Number: 3:2016cv00074
Filed: September 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Dublin Office
County: Laurens
Presiding Judge: Dudley H. Bowen
Referring Judge: Brian K. Epps
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER denying 64 Motion for Attorney Fees. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 03/21/2019. (thb)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting 67 Motion for Reconsideration, and that portion of the 61 Order of January 2, 2019, which determines that Plaintiff is entitled to reasonable attorney's fees and costs is hereby vacated. Plaintiff's counsel shall have fourteen (14) days to respond to the arguments against the award of attorney's fees and costs set forth in the Navy's motion for reconsideration. The Navy is awarded ten (10) days to thereafter to respond. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 02/20/2019. (thb)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting 44 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 53 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting 60 Motion for Leave to File. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of Defendant. A request for a bill of costs and a verified applicati on for reasonable attorney's fees must be submitted by filed within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order. Defendant shall have fourteen (14) days from the date of Plaintiffs submission to file any objections. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 01/02/2019. (thb)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 9/29/16. (cmr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sikes v. United States Department of the Navy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas W. Sikes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Navy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?