Coleman v. Danforth, et al
Plaintiff: Corey Lewis Coleman
Defendant: William Danforth, Sergeant Jordan, Sergeant Taylor, Officer Bell, John Doe, Dr. Chaney, Wilcox, Sam Zanders, Rodney McCloud and Jane Doe
Case Number: 3:2016cv00095
Filed: December 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Dublin Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Dudley H. Bowen
Presiding Judge: Brian K. Epps
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER denying 213 Motion for New Trial; denying 216 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis; denying 217 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 218 Motion for Transcript. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 11/22/2019. (pts)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 212 CLERK'S JUDGMENT re 166 Order adopting the 164 Report and Recommendations in favor of Dr. Chaney, Jill Cravey against Corey Lewis Coleman. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 09/30/2019. (jlh)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 211 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Wilcox, Officer Bell, Rodney McCloud, Sam Zanders, Sergeant Jordan-Thomas, Sergeant Taylor, William Danforth against Corey Lewis Coleman. Signed by Court Room Deputy on 09/26/2019. (jlh)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's motion for the issuance of writs. The case shall proceed to jury trial as scheduled on September 23, 2019. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 9/20/2019. (pts)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER re 158 Motion in Limine. 185 Motion in Limine is granted in part and denied in part, or deferred until trial in accordance with the terms of this Order. Defendants' and Plaintiff's objections to trial exhibits (doc. nos. 182-83) are sustained in part, overruled in part, or deferred until trial in accordance with the terms of this Order. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 09/18/2019. (thb)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER overruling Plaintiff's 165 Objections to the Report and Recommendations. The Court's 164 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations shall stand on the record. The case shall proceed to trial on Plaintiff's Eighth Amendment failure to protect claim for nominal damages against the remaining Defendants. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 04/02/2019. (jlh)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER ADOPTING the 159 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as the Court's opinion; denying Plaintiff's 146 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 142 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court grants summary judgment for Defendants as to Plaintiff's Eighth Amendment claim for denial of medical care against Defendants Chaney and Cravey, First Amendment retaliatory transfer claim, and Fourteenth Amendment due process claim. The case shall proc eed to trial on Plaintiff's Eighth Amendment failure to protect claim for nominal damages only against Danforth, Zanders, McCloud, Wilcox, Jordan-Thomas, Taylor, and Bell; dismissing Defendant John Doe. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 03/29/2019. (jlh)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER ADOPTING the 159 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as the Court's opinion, denying Plaintiff's 146 Motion for Summary Judgment and grants in part and denies in part Defendants' 142 Motion for Summary Judgment. The case shall proceed to trial on Plaintiff's Eighth Amendment failure to protect claim for nominal damages only against Defendants Danforth, Zanders, McCloud, Wilcox, Jordan-Thomas, Taylor, and Bell. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 03/05/2019. (jlh)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER directing service of the 159 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on all parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 02/08/2019. (jlh)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER for Defendants to submit the entire deposition transcript by supplemental filing on or before Wednesday, January 30, 2019 re [143-10] Coleman Deposition Extracts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 01/25/2019. (jlh)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER denying 135 Motion to Compel and 136 Motion for Sanctions. In addition, the Court lifts the stay on the dispositive motion deadline. Parties shall have through and including March 22, 2018 to file motions for summary judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 02/20/2018. (jlh) Modified on 2/20/2018 (jlh).
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 112 Motion to Compel; finding as moot 120 Motion motion to compel discovery; denying 121 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/15/2017. (jlh)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER denying as moot 97 Motion requesting oral deposition order; and 98 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 7/17/17. (cmr)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER that the case will proceed on the basis of the currently screened complaints. The Court reminds the parties that its prior scheduling notice 81 remains in effect and discovery is set to close on June 6, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 4/20/17. (cmr)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER adopting 90 Report and Recommendations; therefore, denying 84 Motion for TRO and 84 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 4/11/17. (cmr)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER directing service of the R&R on all parties 90 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 3/13/17. (cmr)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER directing the Clerk to issue a scheduling order detailing discovery deadlines in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 1/17/17. (cmr)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 64 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 66 Motion to Strike without prejudice. Further, the Court DIRECTS Attorney Boyer to inform the Court within 14 days whether he will accept service for Defendants Zanders and M cCloud and whether Attorney Boyer will be making an appearance on behalf of Defendant Taylor. The Court EXTENDS the time for service of Defendant John Doe through the close of discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 12/21/2016. (pts)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER ADOPTING as modified 43 Report and Recommendations and VACATING 15 Report and Recommendations. The Eighth and Fourteenth Amendment claims against Defendants Bell, Chaney, Danforth, Nurse Doe, Officer D oe, Jordan, McCloud, Wilcox, and Zanders, as well as the First Amendment retaliation claim against Defendant Danforth, are SEVERED and TRANSFERRED to the Southern District of Georgia. The Eighth Amendment conditions of confinement claims; the Eighth Amendment denial of medical care claims against Defendants Bishop, Bryson, Chatman, Danforth, Dean, Lewis, Ward, and Zanders; the Free Exercise Clause of the First Amendment and RLUIPA claim; and the access to the courts claim are DISMISSED without prejudice. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 12/6/2016. (tlh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman v. Danforth, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Lewis Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Danforth
Represented By: Matthew Frantz Boyer
Represented By: Meghan Robson Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Jordan
Represented By: Matthew Frantz Boyer
Represented By: Meghan Robson Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Taylor
Represented By: Matthew Frantz Boyer
Represented By: Meghan Robson Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Bell
Represented By: Matthew Frantz Boyer
Represented By: Meghan Robson Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Chaney
Represented By: Matthew Frantz Boyer
Represented By: Meghan Robson Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilcox
Represented By: Matthew Frantz Boyer
Represented By: Meghan Robson Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Zanders
Represented By: Matthew Frantz Boyer
Represented By: Meghan Robson Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney McCloud
Represented By: Matthew Frantz Boyer
Represented By: Meghan Robson Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?