Moore v. Hall et al
Plaintiff: Willie George Moore
Defendant: Phillip Hall, Jacob Beasley and Jorge Castro
Case Number: 3:2017cv00002
Filed: January 11, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Dublin Office
County: Telfair
Presiding Judge: Dudley H. Bowen
Presiding Judge: Brian K. Epps
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER ADOPTING 91 Report and Recommendations and granting 71 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Jorge Castro. Further, the Court denies any motion for Rule 11 sanctions construed from doc. 75 . This case stands Closed. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 2/13/2019. (pts)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER denying 53 Motion to Compel and denying Plaintiff's request for sanctions therein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 2/1/2018. (pts)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER ADOPTING 46 Report and Recommendations and Denying 38 Motion to Dismiss filed by Jorge Castro. The case shall proceed against Defendant only as ordered herein. Defendant shall file his answer by 12/20/2017 and the stay of discovery is lifted. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 12/6/2017. (pts)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER adopting 32 Report and Recommendation. Therefore, granting 18 Motion to Dismiss. Defendants Hall and Beasley are dismissed from this case. Defendant Castro has 14 days of this order to file a response to the amended complaint. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 6/8/17. (cmr)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying as moot 34 Motion for clarification. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 6/2/17. (cmr)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER directing the defense to inform the Court whether the 18 MOTION to Dismiss the original complaint will be withdrawn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 05/15/2017. (thb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Hall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie George Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?