United of Omaha Life Insurance Company v. Seay et al
Plaintiff: United of Omaha Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Jonathan Seay, David A. Seay, Sarah Lou Seay and Jael M. Connor
Case Number: 3:2018cv00010
Filed: February 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Dublin Office
County: Telfair
Presiding Judge: Dudley H. Bowen
Presiding Judge: Brian K. Epps
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting 39 Motion for Default Judgment; granting 39 Motion for Disbursement of Funds. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of Defendant Jonathan Seay and further ordered to disburse to Jonathan Seay the amount of $219,254.79 plus any accrued interest from the Registry of the Court. This case stands closed. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 3/25/2019. (pts)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting 34 Motion to Deposit Funds; granting 34 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff United shall pay into the registry of the Court the sum of $19,254.79. Upon payment, Plaintiff is discharged from further liability and is to be dismissed from this case. Defendant Jonathan Seay's counterclaims against United are dismissed with prejudice. The death benefit shall remain in the registry of the Court subject to further Order of the Court. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 2/21/2019. (pts)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER directing the parties to file a joint consolidated proposed pretrial order (Pretrial Order due by 3/4/2019.) It is further ordered that this case will be scheduled by the Clerk for a pretrial conference. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 2/6/2019. (pts)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER denying 26 Motion for Summary Judgment. The issue of United's reasonableness in its delay in bringing this interpleader action, as well as issues of unpaid interest, bad faith penalties, and attorney's fees, shall be determined by a trier of fact. This case shall proceed in trial in due course. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 11/09/2018. (jlh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United of Omaha Life Insurance Company v. Seay et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United of Omaha Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Kenton J. Coppage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Seay
Represented By: Russell L. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Seay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Lou Seay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jael M. Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?