United States of America for the Use of Lister Harrell, Saraland, LLLP, and Paradise Farms, Inc. v. Boudreaux et al
Trustee: Joy R. Webster
Appellee: Todd Boudreaux and Liberty Mutual Insurance Co.
Appellant: United States of America for the Use of Lister Harrell, Saraland, LLLP, and Paradise Farms, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00030
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Dudley H Bowen
Referring Judge: Brian K Epps
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Appellants' Brief due by 7/15/2019. (pts)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time. Appellants' Brief due July 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 6/17/2019. (pts)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America for the Use of Lister Harrell, Saraland, LLLP, and Paradise Farms, Inc. re #4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file Appellant Brief to July 15, 2019, (Claxton, Edward)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file Appellant Brief to July 15, 2019, by United States of America for the Use of Lister Harrell, Saraland, LLLP, and Paradise Farms, Inc.. Responses due by 6/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Claxton, Edward)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE and Clerk's Certification of Service to Counsel and Parties of Record. Set/Reset Deadlines: Brief due by 6/14/2019. (pts)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 Transmittal of Bankruptcy Record Appellant Brief due by 6/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 18-03002 Docket Sheet, #2 18-03002 Record on Appeal, #3 12-30111 Docket Sheet, #4 12-30111 Record on Appeal, #5 12-30112 Docket Sheet, #6 12-30112 Record on Appeal, #7 12-30113 Docket Sheet, #8 12-30113 Record on Appeal Part 1, #9 12-30113 Record on Appeal Part 2, #10 13-03004 Docket Sheet, #11 13-03004 Record on Appeal, #12 13-03005 Docket Sheet, #13 13-03005 Record on Appeal, #14 13-03006 Docket Sheet, #15 13-03006 Record on Appeal, #16 14-03013 Docket Sheet, #17 14-03013 Record on Appeal Part 1, #18 14-03013 Record on Appeal Part 2, #19 14-03014 Docket Sheet, #20 14-03014 Record on Appeal, #21 14-03015 Docket Sheet, #22 14-03015 Record on Appeal Part 1, #23 14-03015 Record on Appeal Part 2) (USBC-Toole, Christina)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 18-03002. File received, filed by United States of America for the Use of Lister Harrell, Saraland, LLLP, and Paradise Farms, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Order being appealed, #3 Notice of Appeal, #4 Notice of Defective Appeal, #5 Amended Notice of Appeal, #6 Notice to Appellant)(thb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America for the Use of Lister Harrell, Saraland, LLLP, and Paradise Farms, Inc. v. Boudreaux et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Joy R. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Todd Boudreaux
Represented By: Mark A. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Liberty Mutual Insurance Co.
Represented By: William Randal Bryant
Represented By: John V. Burch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: United States of America for the Use of Lister Harrell, Saraland, LLLP, and Paradise Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas F. Jarriel
Represented By: Edward B. Claxton, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?