Wilkinson v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: James Douglas Wilkinson
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Not Yet Classified: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2019cv00045
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Dudley H Bowen
Referring Judge: Brian K Epps
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hav vice for Attorney Karl E. Osterhout. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 08/01/2019. (jlh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/1/2019: #1 Corrected Main Document) (jlh).
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon Heath Statkus on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill (Statkus, Shannon)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number 113J-2626771, Fee Amount $200, by James Douglas Wilkinson. Responses due by 7/4/2019. (Claxton, Edward)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (jlh)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis subject to objection. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 06/06/2019. (jlh)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by James Douglas Wilkinson. (thb)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James Douglas Wilkinson. (Attachments: #1 Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order)REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(thb) Modified on 6/6/2019 (jlh).
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill, filed by James Douglas Wilkinson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(thb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilkinson v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Douglas Wilkinson
Represented By: Edward B. Claxton, III
Represented By: Karl E Osterhout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Shannon Heath Statkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?