Newton et al v. Roosen Verchetti & Oliver - GA PLLC (LLC) et al
Plaintiff: Jason Newton and Vanzel Newton
Defendant: Transworld Systems, Inc. and Roosen Verchetti & Oliver - GA PLLC (LLC)
Case Number: 3:2019cv00047
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Dublin Office
Presiding Judge: Dudley H Bowen
Referring Judge: Brian K Epps
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 16 First MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses by Jason Newton, Vanzel Newton. Responses due by 8/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Briefs in suport)(Addleton, David)
August 9, 2019 Filing 15 First MOTION to Strike #11 Answer to Complaint with Brief in Support by Jason Newton, Vanzel Newton. Responses due by 8/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Briefs in suport)(Addleton, David)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice for Attorney Kirsten H. Smith. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 08/01/2019. (jlh)
July 31, 2019 PRO HAC VICE PAID by Christian G. Henry for Roosen Verchetti & Oliver - GA PLLC (LLC); Amount $200.00, Receipt # AUG026554, Date: 07/31/2019. (jlh)
July 31, 2019 Filing 13 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kirsten H. Smith Fee Amount $200, by Roosen Verchetti & Oliver - GA PLLC (LLC), Transworld Systems, Inc. Responses due by 8/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit List of Cases by Applicant in SDGa, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order granting admission pro hac)(Henry, Christian) Modified on 7/31/2019 (jlh).
July 22, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Roosen Verchetti & Oliver - GA PLLC (LLC). (Henry, Christian)
July 22, 2019 Filing 11 Roosen Varchetti & Olivier - Ga PLLC's ANSWER to Complaint by Roosen Verchetti & Oliver - GA PLLC (LLC).(Henry, Christian)
July 22, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Transworld Systems, Inc.. (Henry, Christian)
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 Transworld Systems, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint by Transworld Systems, Inc.(Henry, Christian) Modified on 7/22/2019 (jlh).
July 8, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Roosen Verchetti & Oliver - GA PLLC (LLC) answer due 7/22/2019; Transworld Systems, Inc. answer due 7/22/2019. (jlh)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Clerk's Extension of Time (LR 6.1). Defendants must Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint by 07/22/2019. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 07/08/2019. (jlh) Modified on 7/8/2019 (jlh).
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 ***Entered in Error*** (Boone, M.) Modified on 7/8/2019 (jlh).
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 First Motion for Clerks Extension of Time (LR 6.1) to Answer Plaintiffs' Complaint by Roosen Verchetti & Oliver - GA PLLC (LLC), Transworld Systems, Inc.. Responses due by 7/22/2019. (Boone, M.)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jason Newton, Vanzel Newton. Transworld Systems, Inc. served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Addleton, David)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jason Newton, Vanzel Newton. Roosen Verchetti & Oliver - GA PLLC (LLC) served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Addleton, David)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 06/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Blank Forms.) (jlh)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Roosen Verchetti & Oliver - GA PLLC (LLC) and Transworld Systems, Inc. (jlh)
June 13, 2019 Filing fee: $400.00, receipt number 113J-2623052. (jlh)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Roosen Verchetti & Oliver - GA PLLC (LLC), Transworld Systems, Inc., filed by Jason Newton and Vanzel Newton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, and #4 Civil Cover Sheet.)(jlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newton et al v. Roosen Verchetti & Oliver - GA PLLC (LLC) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transworld Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Christian G. Henry
Represented By: M. Beth Boone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roosen Verchetti & Oliver - GA PLLC (LLC)
Represented By: Christian G. Henry
Represented By: Kirsten H. Smith
Represented By: M. Beth Boone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Newton
Represented By: David Franklin Addleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanzel Newton
Represented By: David Franklin Addleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?