Selph v. Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Ernest Selph
Defendant: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00079
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Dudley H Bowen
Referring Judge: Brian K Epps
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Filing 12 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Maple, Christy)
October 29, 2019 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Maple, Christy)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 12/10/2019. Discovery due by 2/28/2020. Motions due by 3/30/2020. Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 12/16/2019. Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 1/14/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/21/2019. (thb)
October 17, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Manly, John)
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Ernest Selph. (Manly, John)
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Ernest Selph. (Manly, John)
October 11, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED ANSWER to by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Policy))(Maple, Christy)
October 11, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Hartford Fire Insurance Company.(Maple, Christy)
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John Bell Manly on behalf of Ernest Selph (Manly, John)
October 11, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Hartford Fire Insurance Company answer due 10/17/2019. (thb)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Blank forms for new civil case filings) (thb)
October 10, 2019 Filing 2 REMOVAL NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD re #1 Notice of Removal. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 10/20/2019. (thb)
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hartford Fire Insurance Company from Superior Court of Telfair County, State of GA, case number 19-CV-097. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113J-2702770), filed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Civil Cover Sheet, Summons, Complaint, Request for Production, and U.S.C.R. 5.2 Certificate, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service, #3 Exhibit C - Real Estate Transaction Ticket, #4 Exhibit D- Notice of Filing Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(thb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/10/2019: #6 Cetificate) (thb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Selph v. Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Selph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Christy Maple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?